This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 06:45:21 (UTC).

LOPEZ -V- AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 LOPEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICAN BOLT SCREW MFG CORP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8902

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALFONSO LOPEZ

Defendant

AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOULD & ASSOCIATES

17822 East 17Th Street Suite 106

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendant Attorney

BEST, BEST & KRIEGER, LLP

3390 University Avenue 5Th Fl Po Box 1028

Riverside, CA 92502

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO ARBITRATE AND STAY COURT PROCEEDINGS FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO ARBITRATE AND STAY COURT PROCEEDINGS FILED.

MOTION RE: DEF COMPEL ARBITRATION 10/27/17 FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

MOTION RE: DEF COMPEL ARBITRATION 10/27/17 FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY TRISTAN KIRK FOR PLAINTIFF.; (VIA COURT CALL); ATTORNEY TRISTAN KIRK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP..; MOTION; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:11; AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP.'S MOTION COMPEL ARBITRATION IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; DEFENDANT COUNSEL REPRESENTS TO THE COURT THAT STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE WAS SUBMITTED TO THE; COURT ON 12/04/17. PARTIES ARE IN THE PROCESS OF SELECTING ARBITRATOR.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT SIGNS STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ARBITRATE AND STAY COURT PROCEEDINGS SUBMITTED; BY DEFENDANT COUNSEL ON 12/04/17.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION SET FOR 03/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:12; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA ALVAREZ IN SUPP OF MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRTN FILED

DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA ALVAREZ IN SUPP OF MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRTN FILED

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH T ORTIZ IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRT FILED

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH T ORTIZ IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRT FILED

MOTION RE: DEF COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 01/25/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: DEF COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 01/25/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO ARBITRATE AND STAY COURT PROCEEDINGS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: DEF COMPEL ARBITRATION 10/27/17 FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY TRISTAN KIRK FOR PLAINTIFF.; (VIA COURT CALL); ATTORNEY TRISTAN KIRK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP..; MOTION; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:11; AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP.'S MOTION COMPEL ARBITRATION IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; DEFENDANT COUNSEL REPRESENTS TO THE COURT THAT STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE WAS SUBMITTED TO THE; COURT ON 12/04/17. PARTIES ARE IN THE PROCESS OF SELECTING ARBITRATOR.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT SIGNS STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ARBITRATE AND STAY COURT PROCEEDINGS SUBMITTED; BY DEFENDANT COUNSEL ON 12/04/17.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION SET FOR 03/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:12; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP. FOR STIP TO CONTINUE; Minutes; Receipt: 171204-0996 $20.00; 171204-0996-CK Reference Number #379786

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF ALFONSO LOPEZ FOR AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP., ATTORNEY BEST, BEST & KRIEGER, LLP ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA ALVAREZ IN SUPP OF MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRTN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JOSEPH T ORTIZ IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP. FOR 1ST APP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171027-0651 $380.00; 171027-0651-CK Reference Number CK#12059

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON AMERICAN BOLT & SCREW MFG. CORP.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM EMP TO EMPM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ALFONSO LOPEZ FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALFONSO LOPEZ FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0064 $380.00; 170927-0064-CK Reference Number 8133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less