This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 16:56:05 (UTC).

LOMELI VS AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 LOMELI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7131

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

JESUS LOMELI

AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE

Defendants and Others

LORI FISHER

AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO LORI FISHER. PARTY SERVED ON 10/25/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PRESONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO LORI FISHER. PARTY SERVED ON 10/25/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PRESONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE. PARTY SERVED ON 09/19/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE. PARTY SERVED ON 09/19/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0738 $75.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE WAS DISMISSED IN COURT ALREADY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JESUS LOMELI, AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE, LORI FISHER; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:41; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: -.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); 11:42; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE FOR DEFENDANTS CLAIM; Minutes; Receipt: 171106-0787 $30.00; 171106-0787-CK Reference Number 7496

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO LORI FISHER. PARTY SERVED ON 10/25/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PRESONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO AMERICA MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE. PARTY SERVED ON 09/19/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0738 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less