This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 10:44:09 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL -V- TRACY A ACEVEDO

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 LOBEL FINANCIAL -V- TRACY A ACEVEDO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3464

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP.,

Defendant

TRACY A ACEVEDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBEL, GARY DEAN

1150 N.Magnolia Ave

Anaheim, CA 92801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( $3,528.03 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180305-0726 $25.00; 180305-0726-CK Reference Number 1058544

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $133.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $63.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $119.19) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180119-0053 $25.00; 180119-0053-CK Reference Number 1048619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., ORDERED ENTERED 11/15/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP.,; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TRACY A ACEVEDO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,553.02 INTEREST $355.20 ATTORNEY FEES $243.00 COSTS $275.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,426.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SHILOY KRAUSE RE CCP 1033 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TRACY A ACEVEDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., AS TO TRACY A ACEVEDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TRACY A ACEVEDO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $35.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0608 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 22.95 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 03/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,553.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less