This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:34:52 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL -V- TARIN

Case Summary

On 10/05/2017 LOBEL FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TARIN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9520

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801

Defendant

SAMANTHA TARIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORPORATION

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/05/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/05/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/05/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP ORDERED ENTERED 01/29/18; JUDGMENT FOR: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SAMANTHA TARIN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,854.24 INTEREST $356.73 ATTORNEY FEES $321.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,841.97; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/05/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/05/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP AS TO DOES ONLY

BALANCE MEMORANDUM FILED.

BALANCE MEMORANDUM FILED.

DECLARATION OF SHILOY KRAUSE RE: CCP 585 FILED

DECLARATION OF SHILOY KRAUSE RE: CCP 585 FILED

DECLARATION OF SHILOY KRAUSE RE: CCP 1033 FILED

DECLARATION OF SHILOY KRAUSE RE: CCP 1033 FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SAMANTHA TARIN.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SAMANTHA TARIN.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SAMANTHA TARIN SERVED ON 11/29/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SAMANTHA TARIN SERVED ON 11/29/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180315-0791 $25.00; 180315-0791-CK Reference Number 1059696

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/05/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/05/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP ORDERED ENTERED 01/29/18; JUDGMENT FOR: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SAMANTHA TARIN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,854.24 INTEREST $356.73 ATTORNEY FEES $321.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,841.97; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/05/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • BALANCE MEMORANDUM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF SHILOY KRAUSE RE: CCP 585 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF SHILOY KRAUSE RE: CCP 1033 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SAMANTHA TARIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/05/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP AS TO SAMANTHA TARIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SAMANTHA TARIN SERVED ON 11/29/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171010-0074 $240.00; 171010-0074-CK Reference Number 1028626

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.