This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:04:43 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL -V- SLEEUWENHOEK

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 LOBEL FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SLEEUWENHOEK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2289

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA

Defendants

WILLEM SLEEUWENHOEK

OKSANA SLEEUWENHOEK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBEL, GARY DEAN

1150 N.Magnolia Ave

Anaheim, CA 92801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 5412.76 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180112-0102 $25.00; 180112-0102-CK Reference Number CK-1042808

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $82.65)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MISSING 2ND JUDGMENT DEBTOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 171129-0818 $25.00; 171129-0818-CK Reference Number 1040764

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 10/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: OKSANA SLEEUWENHOEK, WILLEM SLEEUWENHOEK; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,807.85 INTEREST $798.26 ATTORNEY FEES $329.00 COSTS $370.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,305.11; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OKSANA SLEEUWENHOEK; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COA IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEEDS SIGNATURE, PLEASE RESUBMIT SIGNED -.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0143 $240.00; 170208-0143-CK Reference Number CK#972079

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.