This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 10:44:27 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL -V- REGINA M HUDDLESTON

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 LOBEL FINANCIAL -V- REGINA M HUDDLESTON was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3465

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP.,

Defendant

REGINA M HUDDLESTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBEL, GARY DEAN

1150 N.Magnolia Ave

Anaheim, CA 92801

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; MICHAEL DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA MORALES; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; CLAIM OF EXEMPTION DENIED.; COURT NOTES NO APPEARANCE BY PARTIES.; THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY MONIES HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT.; LEVYING OFFICER LOCATION: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY; ORDER TO LEVYING OFFICER PRINTED FOR REGINA M HUDDLESTON; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:57; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FORM FILED BY REGINA M HUDDLESTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FINANCIAL STATEMENT FILED BY REGINA M HUDDLESTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • MEMO FROM SB SHERIFFS CLAIMING $0 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • NO SASE PROVIDED: CONFROM CLAIM OF EXEMPTION DOCS PLACED IN LOBBY BIN "G"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., FOR NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Minutes; Receipt: 180712-0069 $90.00; 180712-0069-CK Reference Number #1088134

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO REGINA M HUDDLESTON SERVED ON 08/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0615 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 22.95 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 02/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,897.76

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less