This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:11:44 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL-V-HUDORF

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 LOBEL FINANCIAL-V-HUDORF was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9068

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP.

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801

Defendant

MARJORIE HUDORF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORPORATION

1150 N. Magnolia Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARJORIE HUDORF WITH COSTS OF $70.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARJORIE HUDORF WITH COSTS OF $70.00

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARJORIE HUDORF WITH COSTS OF $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0359 $240.00; 170928-0359-CK Reference Number 1027456

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,082.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 22.95 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 08/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less