This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:11:23 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL -V- GIBSON

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 LOBEL FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GIBSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2312

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

SHYWONE LATRON GIBSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBEL, GARY DEAN

1150 N.Magnolia Ave

Anaheim, CA 92801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 6801.71 ); Minutes; Receipt: 170804-0612 $25.00; 170804-0612-CK Reference Number 1013030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $111.02)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170613-0220 $25.00; 170613-0220-CK Reference Number 998817

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP ORDERED ENTERED 05/12/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SHYWONE LATRON GIBSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,448.01 INTEREST $526.68 ATTORNEY FEES $416.00 COSTS $275.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,665.69; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: SHILOY KRAUSE CCP 1033 FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • BALANCE MEMORANDUM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SHILOY KRAUSE CCP 585 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SHYWONE LATRON GIBSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SHYWONE LATRON GIBSON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $35.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0077 $240.00; 170208-0077-CK Reference Number 971133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.