This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:25:16 (UTC).

LOANME, INC., -v- MONICA AGUIRRE

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 LOANME, INC , -v- MONICA AGUIRRE was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9161

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

MONICA AGUIRRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULVANEY BARRY BEATTY LINN & MAYERS LLP

401 West A Street, 17Th Streee 17Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-7994

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HRG RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY SENT.

NOTICE OF HRG RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT A HEARING RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY HAS BEEN SET FOR MARCH 21, 2018 AT; 8:30 IN DEP S31

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MONICA AGUIRRE FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MONICA AGUIRRE FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MONICA AGUIRRE SERVED ON 10/16/17 WITH FEES OF $500.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MONICA AGUIRRE SERVED ON 10/16/17 WITH FEES OF $500.00.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND STAY FILED BY MONICA AGUIRRE; BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IS 6:17-BK-19876-MH. (ENTIRE CASE STAYED)

NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND STAY FILED BY MONICA AGUIRRE; BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IS 6:17-BK-19876-MH. (ENTIRE CASE STAYED)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND STAY FILED BY MONICA AGUIRRE; BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IS 6:17-BK-19876-MH. (ENTIRE CASE STAYED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HRG RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT A HEARING RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY HAS BEEN SET FOR MARCH 21, 2018 AT; 8:30 IN DEP S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF LOANME, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO MONICA AGUIRRE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MONICA AGUIRRE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MONICA AGUIRRE SERVED ON 10/16/17 WITH FEES OF $500.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LOANME, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LOANME, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171002-0087 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less