This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 12:31:34 (UTC).

LIZARRAGA-V-LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2016 LIZARRAGA-V-LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5889

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUGO LIZARRAGA

Defendant

LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MENDOZA & HARRISON, APC

300 East San Antonio Dr

Long Beach, CA 90807

PERONA,LANGER, BECK, SERBIN & HARRISON

300 San Antonio Drive

Long Beach, CA 90807-0948

Defendant Attorney

CLAYSON, BAINER & SAUNDERS, APLC

601 S Main St

Corona, CA 92882

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: BRENNAN S. KAHN IN SUPP OF MOT TO COMPEL FILED BY HUGO LIZARRAGA

DECLARATION RE: BRENNAN S. KAHN IN SUPP OF MOT TO COMPEL FILED BY HUGO LIZARRAGA

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER TESTIMONY SET FOR HEARING ON 01/29/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUGO LIZARRAGA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER TESTIMONY SET FOR HEARING ON 01/29/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUGO LIZARRAGA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER TESTIMONY SET FOR HEARING ON 01/29/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUGO LIZARRAGA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER TESTIMONY SET FOR HEARING ON 01/29/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUGO LIZARRAGA (IMAGED)

NTC OF TSC AND RULING REGARDING PLAS MTNS TO COMPEL DEFS FURTHER RESPONSES FILED.

NTC OF TSC AND RULING REGARDING PLAS MTNS TO COMPEL DEFS FURTHER RESPONSES FILED.

NTC OF TSC AND RULING REGARDING PLAS MTNS TO COMPEL DEFS FURTHER RESPONSES FILED.

NTC OF TSC AND RULING REGARDING PLAS MTNS TO COMPEL DEFS FURTHER RESPONSES FILED.

DEFS SEPARATE STATEMENT ISO DEFS OPPOS TO MTN COMPELLING FURTHER PROD OF DOCS FILED.

DEFS SEPARATE STATEMENT ISO DEFS OPPOS TO MTN COMPELLING FURTHER PROD OF DOCS FILED.

DEFS SEPARATE STATEMENT ISO DEFS OPPOS TO MTN COMPELLING FURTHER PROD OF DOCS FILED.

DEFS SEPARATE STATEMENT ISO DEFS OPPOS TO MTN COMPELLING FURTHER PROD OF DOCS FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQ FOR PROD SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQ FOR PROD SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQ FOR PROD SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQ FOR PROD SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLA MIL#3 SET FOR HEARING ON 09/12/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLA MIL#3 SET FOR HEARING ON 09/12/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLA MIL#1 SET FOR HEARING ON 09/12/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLA MIL#1 SET FOR HEARING ON 09/12/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

REPLY TO PLA OPP TO DEF TO MOTION RE: MIL#1 SET FOR HEARING ON 09/12/18 FILED BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO PLA OPP TO DEF TO MOTION RE: MIL#1 SET FOR HEARING ON 09/12/18 FILED BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL THE FURTHER TESTIMONY OF MURRAY SET FOR HEARING ON 04/03/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUGO LIZARRAGA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL THE FURTHER TESTIMONY OF MURRAY SET FOR HEARING ON 04/03/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUGO LIZARRAGA (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF EMILY C. MEESON IN SUPT OF DEF OPP TO PLA MTN TO C FILED

DECLARATION OF EMILY C. MEESON IN SUPT OF DEF OPP TO PLA MTN TO C FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEF OPPOS, SEP STMNT IN SUPRT, DECL BY DEF ON 04/05/17 AS TO PLA, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEF OPPOS, SEP STMNT IN SUPRT, DECL BY DEF ON 04/05/17 AS TO PLA, FILED.

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPS FILED.

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPS FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF CLAYSON, MANN, YAEGER & HANSEN FOR LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER CHANGES ITS NAME TO CLAYSON, BAINER & SAUNDERS, APLC FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF CLAYSON, MANN, YAEGER & HANSEN FOR LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER CHANGES ITS NAME TO CLAYSON, BAINER & SAUNDERS, APLC FILED

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO GILBERT OCHOA.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO GILBERT OCHOA.

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEF REPLIES OF MIL#1-3 BY MAIL, FAX, EMAIL ON 09/06/18 AS TO PLA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLA MIL#3 SET FOR HEARING ON 09/12/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF EMILY C.MEESON IN SUPT OF DEF OPP TO PLA MIL#3 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF EMILY C.MEESON IN SUPT OF DEF OPP TO PLA MIL#1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLA MIL#2 SET FOR HEARING ON 09/12/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLA MIL#1 SET FOR HEARING ON 09/12/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DEF REPLYS TO MIL#1-3 NEED SIGNATURE ON POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEF MIL#1-5 & DECL OF EMILY MEESON BY LEAVING COPIES WITH COMPANY RECEPTIONIST ON 04/30/18 AS TO PLA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO GILBERT OCHOA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CLAYSON, MANN, YAEGER & HANSEN.; Minutes; Receipt: 161028-0658 $435.00; 161028-0658-CK Reference Number CK 35440

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/04/16 WITH COSTS OF $80.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HUGO LIZARRAGA FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160926-0276 $435.00; 160926-0276-CK Reference Number 35149

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.