This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 15:13:08 (UTC).

LIVING TRUST OF EUGENE MONTE NACCARATO

Case Summary

On 03/24/2017 LIVING TRUST OF EUGENE MONTE NACCARATO was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0269

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Intervenors

JOHN LAMBRECHT

MICHAEL C. MADDUX

San Bernardino, CA 92408

NORA J MORALES

HELLEN BUSH

Other

LIVING TRUST OF EUGENE MONTE NACCARATO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MADDUX, MICHAEL C

1894 Commercenter Drive West Ste 108

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C MADDUX FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C MADDUX FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C MADDUX FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C MADDUX FILED

EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO STORAGE FILED.

EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO STORAGE FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION RE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO MR.JOSEPH F. NOWICKI NOTICE OF RULING BY MAIL ON 07/12/18 AS TO HELEN BUSH C/O JOSEPH NOWICKI, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • OBJECTION TO MR.JOSEPH F. NOWICKI NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JOHN LAMBRECHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT GARY TREADWAY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL MADDUX PRESENT FOR JOHN LAMRECHT.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: VACATED/FUTURE DATE ALREADY SET; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULINGS FILED BY HELLEN BUSH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • HRG OF 07/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • MOTION RE: NOTICE OF MOTION TO REQUEST ORDERS TO COMPEL RESPONSES FILED BY PETITIONER HELLEN BUSH; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL C. MADDUX PRESENT FOR JOHN LAMBRECHT, PRESENT.; ATTORNEY JOSEPH F. NOWICKI PRESENT FOR HELLEN BUSH.; NORA J. MORALES PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MOTION; HELLEN BUSH'S MOTION TO REQUEST ORDERS TO COMPEL RESPONSES IS HEARD.; COURT FINDS:; HELLEN BUSH'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES IS GRANTED.; COURT ORDERS MR. TOM SALGADO TO GIVE FULL AND COMPLETE ANSWERS WITHOUT OBJECTIONS DUE BY; 7/13/18.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON TOM SALGADO IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $1,200.00 PAYABLE TO J. NOWICKIS LAW FIRM ON OR BEFORE 07/31/18.; ($1,200.00 SANCTION IMPOSED ON TOM SALGADO FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PROPOUNDED DISCOVERY.); COURT ORDERS MR. JOHN LAMBRECHT TO GIVE FULL AND COMPLETE ANSWERS WITHOUT OBJECTIONS BY 7/13/18.; THE COURT IMPOSES AND SUSPENDS SANCTIONS OF $1,200 AGAINST MR. JOHN LAMBRECHT, IF MR.; LAMBRECHT HAS ALL HTE RESPONSES COMPLETED BY JULY 13 AND TO MR. NOWICKIS OFFICE, THE; SANCTION WILL BE PERMANENTLY STAYED.; COURT ORDERS INITIAL PETITION BE SET FOR HEAIRNG.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: PETITION RE TRUST SET FOR 10/29/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • HEARING RE: PRETRIAL ON CONTEMPT; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL C. MADDUX PRESENT FOR JOHN LAMBRECHT, PRESENT.; ATTORNEY JOSEPH F. NOWICKI PRESENT FOR HELLEN BUSH.; NORA MORALES PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL NOWICKI, COURT ORDERS HEARING RE: PRETRIAL ON CONTEMPT DISMISSED; WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: REQUESTED TO BE DIMISSED BY COUNSEL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • HEARING RE: PTN TO INTERVENE AND FOR DEC RELIEF; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL C. MADDUX PRESENT FOR JOHN LAMBRECHT, PRESENT.; ATTORNEY JOSEPH F. NOWICKI PRESENT FOR HELLEN BUSH.; NORA J. MORALES PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: NOTICE NEEDS TO BE COMPLETED.; COURT ORDERS MR. NOWICKI AND HIS CLIENT TO BE AVAILABLE FOR MR. MADDUX AND MR. LAMBRECHT TO; WORK OUT A DATE TO SEE THE PROPERTY.; MR. MADDUX AND MR. LAMBRECHT ARE TO GIVE AT LEAST; A TEN DAY NOTICE TO MR. NOWICKI AND HIS CLIENT.; COURT SETS A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/29/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S37P; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JOHN LAMBRECHT FOR PETITION AND COURT REPORTER FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOHN LAMBRECHT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JOHN LAMBRECHT IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EX PARTE PETITION GRANTING ACCESS RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C MADDUX FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO STORAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less