This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:57:08 (UTC).

LISA CONNER-V- DONALD COLLIER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/13/2016 LISA CONNER-V- DONALD COLLIER was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0017

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

DONALD COLLIER

Respondent

LISA CONNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 05/01/17.

REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 05/01/17.

JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FROM H.G. LONG FOR LISA CONNER(PRO PER STATUS) FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FROM H.G. LONG FOR LISA CONNER(PRO PER STATUS) FILED.

ORDER APPLICATION FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONDENTS BRIEF-RESPONDENT TO COMPLY WITH ORDER RE: BRIEF FILED

ORDER APPLICATION FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONDENTS BRIEF-RESPONDENT TO COMPLY WITH ORDER RE: BRIEF FILED

LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE RESPONDENTS BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE RESPONDENTS BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DONALD COLLIER FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DONALD COLLIER FILED.

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CLERKS TRANSCRIPT/ 1 VOL REPORTERS TRANSCRPT

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CLERKS TRANSCRIPT/ 1 VOL REPORTERS TRANSCRPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 05/01/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • APPEAL AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A KNISH, JUDGE; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; ANNEMARIE G PACE, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERYL FRANZEN; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; BAILIFF: LOZANO; DONALD COLLIER PRESENT IN PRO PER.; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; FOLLOWING ORAL ARGUMENT BY DONALD COLLIER, COURT TAKES CASE UNDER SUBMISSION.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • CASE PREPARED FOR APRIL CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LISA CONNER FOR RESPONDENTS BRIEF; Minutes; Receipt: 170126-0917 $20.00; 170126-0917-CK Reference Number 1931

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • PARTY LISA CONNER UPDATED: MAILING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2016
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 12/02/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DONALD COLLIER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 11/16/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 10/17/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CLERKS TRANSCRIPT/ 1 VOL REPORTERS TRANSCRPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #UDFS1601748- FONTANA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.