This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 03:01:15 (UTC).

LINDEN COURT VS THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 LINDEN COURT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against THOMPSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8742

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDEN COURT, LLC

Defendant

DELVAN THOMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DELVAN THOMPSON; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DELVAN THOMPSON; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF LINDEN COURT, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 12/22/16; JUDGMENT FOR: LINDEN COURT, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DELVAN THOMPSON; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DELVAN THOMPSON. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0575 $255.00; 161214-0575-CK Reference Number 527881

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF LINDEN COURT, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: LINDEN COURT, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DELVAN THOMPSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,520.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $475.00 AND DAMAGES $1,215.60.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,710.60; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DELVAN THOMPSON.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DELVAN THOMPSON.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF LINDEN COURT, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: LINDEN COURT, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DELVAN THOMPSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,520.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $475.00 AND DAMAGES $1,215.60.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,710.60; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $475.00, ATTORNEY FEES $500.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 01/24/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF LINDEN COURT, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 12/22/16; JUDGMENT FOR: LINDEN COURT, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DELVAN THOMPSON; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DELVAN THOMPSON. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DELVAN THOMPSON; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DELVAN THOMPSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF LINDEN COURT, LLC AS TO DELVAN THOMPSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $50.65.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0575 $255.00; 161214-0575-CK Reference Number 527881

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.