This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 03:01:28 (UTC).

LINDEN COURT VS GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 LINDEN COURT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8743

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDEN COURT, LLC

Defendant

MARISSA GUTIERREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL GOODWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; LINDEN COURT, LLC REPRESENTED BY SHAWN DAVIS.; DEFENDANT MARISSA GUTIERREZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:09; LINDEN COURT, LLC'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS IS HEARD.; SHAWN DAVIS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; WITNESS -- MARISSA GUTIERREZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS GRANTED.; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF LINDEN COURT, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/11/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LINDEN COURT, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARISSA GUTIERREZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,339.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $490.93.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,634.93; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARISSA GUTIERREZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT GRANTED AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT GRANTED AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 09:12; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED TO PLA AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED TO PLA AT COUNTER)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARISSA GUTIERREZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARISSA GUTIERREZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0585 $255.00; 161214-0585-CK Reference Number 527879

ANSWER FILED BY MARISSA GUTIERREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY MARISSA GUTIERREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED TO PLA AT COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LINDEN COURT, LLC FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 170111-0234 $25.00; 170111-0234-CK Reference Number 528774

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL GOODWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; LINDEN COURT, LLC REPRESENTED BY SHAWN DAVIS.; DEFENDANT MARISSA GUTIERREZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:09; LINDEN COURT, LLC'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS IS HEARD.; SHAWN DAVIS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; WITNESS -- MARISSA GUTIERREZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS GRANTED.; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF LINDEN COURT, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/11/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LINDEN COURT, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARISSA GUTIERREZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,339.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $490.93.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,634.93; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARISSA GUTIERREZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT GRANTED AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT GRANTED AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 09:12; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MARISSA GUTIERREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARISSA GUTIERREZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MARISSA GUTIERREZ FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY MARISSA GUTIERREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $44.63.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0585 $255.00; 161214-0585-CK Reference Number 527879

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,339.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.