This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/08/2019 at 00:43:14 (UTC).

LINDA RIVERA MORA -V- THE ESTATE OF ESTANISLAO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 LINDA RIVERA MORA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE ESTATE OF ESTANISLAO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1689

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO,

Defendants

THE ESTATE OF ESTANISLAO CORCOLES

DAVID CAMACHO JR

KATHY RIVERA PACHECO

THE ESTATE OF ESTANISLAO GARCIA CORCOLES

SYLVIA CAMACHO

LUPE RIVERA HOWELL

GILBERT CORCOLES RIVERA

LUCY CORCOLES GUERRERO

JUDITH CORCOLES

RENEE CAMACHO

RANDOLPH (RANDY) CORCOLES

ALBERT CAMACHO

LOUIE CAMACHO

ROBERT CORCOLES RIVERA

ALICE CORCOLES CORNEJO

YOLANDA RIVERA

SEAN A CAMACHO

RICHARD CAMACHO JR

RUDY CORCOLES JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUYNH, DAVID M

1861 West La Habra Blvd

La Habra, CA 90631

 

Court Documents

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO, ORDERED ENTERED 12/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO,; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LUCY CORCOLES GUERRERO, RENEE CAMACHO, ALBERT CAMACHO, RICHARD CAMACHO JR, DAVID CAMACHO JR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SEAN A CAMACHO, SYLVIA CAMACHO, LOUIE CAMACHO, ALICE CORCOLES CORNEJO, RUDY CORCOLES JR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUDITH CORCOLES, RANDOLPH (RANDY) CORCOLES, LUPE RIVERA HOWELL, ROBERT CORCOLES RIVERA, YOLANDA RIVERA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KATHY RIVERA PACHECO, GILBERT CORCOLES RIVERA; PLAS HELD AND CONTINUE TO HOLD AN INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY AS FEE SIMPLE OWNER ON THE BASIS OF; ADVERSE POSSESSION. DEFS OWN NO RIGHT, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY.; *SEE JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS*; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT PACKET BY MAIL ON 09/11/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT PACKET BY MAIL ON 09/11/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY KATHY RIVERA PACHECO WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 06/23/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY KATHY RIVERA PACHECO WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 06/23/17 FILED

REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: PROVE UP HEARING FILED BY LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO,.

REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: PROVE UP HEARING FILED BY LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO,.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ALBERT CAMACHO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $88.63 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ALBERT CAMACHO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $88.63 FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO THE ESTATE OF ESTANISLAO GARCIACORCOLES, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO THE ESTATE OF ESTANISLAO GARCIACORCOLES, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY SEAN A CAMACHO WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 06/23/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY SEAN A CAMACHO WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 06/23/17 FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO LUPE RIVERA HOWELL. PARTY SERVED ON 06/20/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NTC & ACKNWLDGMNT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO LUPE RIVERA HOWELL. PARTY SERVED ON 06/20/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NTC & ACKNWLDGMNT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY ROBERT CORCOLES RIVERA WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 06/24/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY ROBERT CORCOLES RIVERA WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 06/24/17 FILED

ORDER TO QUIET TITLE FILED

ORDER TO QUIET TITLE FILED

NOTICE OF RETURNED COURT JUDGMENT SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED COURT JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; PER JUDICIAL REVIEW, COURT JUDGMENT REQUIRES A DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING. PLEASE SEE ATTACHED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO YOLANDA RIVERA. PARTY SERVED ON 06/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NTC & ACKNWLDGMNT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO YOLANDA RIVERA. PARTY SERVED ON 06/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NTC & ACKNWLDGMNT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO SEAN A CAMACHO. PARTY SERVED ON 06/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NTC & ACKNWLDGMNT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO SEAN A CAMACHO. PARTY SERVED ON 06/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NTC & ACKNWLDGMNT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON LUCY CORCOLES GUERRERO, RENEE CAMACHO, ALBERT CAMACHO, RICHARD CAMACHO JR, DAVID CAMACHO JR, SEAN A CAMACHO, SYLVIA CAMACHO, LOUIE CAMACHO, ALICE CORCOLES CORNEJO, RUDY CORCOLES JR.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON LUCY CORCOLES GUERRERO, RENEE CAMACHO, ALBERT CAMACHO, RICHARD CAMACHO JR, DAVID CAMACHO JR, SEAN A CAMACHO, SYLVIA CAMACHO, LOUIE CAMACHO, ALICE CORCOLES CORNEJO, RUDY CORCOLES JR.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO,

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO,

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171220-0676 $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO QUIET TITLE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO, ORDERED ENTERED 12/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO,; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LUCY CORCOLES GUERRERO, RENEE CAMACHO, ALBERT CAMACHO, RICHARD CAMACHO JR, DAVID CAMACHO JR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SEAN A CAMACHO, SYLVIA CAMACHO, LOUIE CAMACHO, ALICE CORCOLES CORNEJO, RUDY CORCOLES JR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUDITH CORCOLES, RANDOLPH (RANDY) CORCOLES, LUPE RIVERA HOWELL, ROBERT CORCOLES RIVERA, YOLANDA RIVERA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KATHY RIVERA PACHECO, GILBERT CORCOLES RIVERA; PLAS HELD AND CONTINUE TO HOLD AN INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY AS FEE SIMPLE OWNER ON THE BASIS OF; ADVERSE POSSESSION. DEFS OWN NO RIGHT, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY.; *SEE JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS*; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO, FOR POSTAGE & ENVELOPE; Minutes; Receipt: 171208-0310 $0.71; 171208-0310-VS Reference Number #033-0044716095

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID M. HUYNH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO, PRESENT; RUDY MORA PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- LYDIA RIVERA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- LINDA RIVERA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- RUDY MORA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S) 1 - TAX BILLS FOR PAST FIVE YEARS ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE.; ATTORNEY DAVID M. HUYNH PROVIDES OFFER OF PROOF. LINDA AND LYDIA RIVERA ACCEPT OFFER OF PROOF; PROVIDED AS THEIR OWN TESTIMONY UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY.; COURT FINDS:; COURT GRANTS RELIEF REQUESTED.; COUNSEL TO PREPARE JUDGMENT AND ORDER.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: PROVE UP HEARING FILED BY LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED COURT JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; PER JUDICIAL REVIEW, COURT JUDGMENT REQUIRES A DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING. PLEASE SEE ATTACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT CCP 585(D) FILED BY LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO,

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NAME OF DEFENDANT MUST MATCH NAME OF DEFENDANT AS LISTED ON COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NEED TO FILE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE: A CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ASUMMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED FOR FILING AT THE; TIME OF FILING OF THE COMPLAINT. PLEASE SUBMIT A CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND SUMMONS AS SOON AS; POSSIBLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LINDA RIVER A MORA& LYDIA RIVERA SZABO, FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0191 $435.00; 170131-0191-VS Reference Number #026-0004372850

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PARTY THE ESTATE OF ESTANISLAO GARCIACORCOLES UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.