This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2018 at 11:35:01 (UTC).

LINDA F. BARBEE-V-BANK OF AMERICA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/13/2011 LINDA F BARBEE-V-BANK OF AMERICA was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8255

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

LINDA F. BARBEE

Defendants and Respondents

RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP,

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

ROBERT F SCHAUER

215 North Second Avenue Ste F

Upland, CA 91786

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MCGUIREWOODS LLP

1800 Century Park East 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

MCGUIREWOODSLLP

1800 Century Park East 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2015
  • REMITTITUR ROUTED TO DC FOR FILE BACK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • COPY OF RFA ORDER AND REMITTITUR SENT TO LEGAL RESEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • ORDER ON RFA RE: REMITTITUR FILED WITH APPEALS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED BY REVIEWING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • APPEAL FILED 01/10/2013 OF LINDA BARBEE COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • REMITTITUR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT DIV TWO APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • $100.00 PAID TO APPEALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • $255.00 PAID TO ROBERT SCHAUER REFUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • $110.00 PAID TO CYNTHIA GARCIA TRANSCRIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2011
  • MOTIONS SENT TO MOTION BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DEMURRER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,, RECONTRUST COMPANY,N.A., MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,; REPRESENTED BY MCGUIREWOODSLLP; Minutes; Receipt: 111101-3782 $1,185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DEMURRER FILED BY BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP,; REPRESENTED BY MCGUIREWOODS LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING ROBERT F SCHAUER WITH COMBS & SCHAERTEL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR LINDA F. BARBEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110916-0424 $33.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/13/2011 OF LINDA BARBEE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110913-2056 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less