This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 17:23:10 (UTC).

LIDO-V-JONES

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 LIDO-V-JONES was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1481

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIDO CONDOMINIUMS,LLC

Defendant

GENEVA JONES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN AT COUNTER)

STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL GOODWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT GENEVA JONES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:23; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: LIDO CONDOMINIUMS,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GENEVA JONES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,080.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $1,584.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,469.00; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GENEVA JONES. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 05/01/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 09:24; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO GENEVA JONES SERVED ON 03/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO GENEVA JONES SERVED ON 03/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ANSWER FILED BY GENEVA JONES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY GENEVA JONES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170303-0503 $255.00; 170303-0503-CK Reference Number 531061

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2017
  • AMENDED RETURN WRIT OF POSSESSION UNSATISFIED/COSTS OF $145 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN AT COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170413-0178 $25.00; 170413-0178-CK Reference Number 532244

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL GOODWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT GENEVA JONES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:23; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: LIDO CONDOMINIUMS,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GENEVA JONES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,080.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $1,584.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,469.00; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GENEVA JONES. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 05/01/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 09:24; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • RTS/POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GENEVA JONES IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GENEVA JONES FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY GENEVA JONES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • ANSWER, POS, FW REQUEST RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,080.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $36.00.--BEGINNING ON 03/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170303-0503 $255.00; 170303-0503-CK Reference Number 531061

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.