This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 05:42:35 (UTC).

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE -V- CHRISTOPHER CASSIDY

Case Summary

On 08/05/2010 LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER CASSIDY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0045

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER C CASSIDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY W PARKS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/04/2011

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2010

DocketOSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2010

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2010

DocketAMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DUE DILIGENCE NEEDS 3 DIFFERENT DAYS AT 3 DIFFERENT TIMES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010

DocketPARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010

DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010

DocketCOMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100812-2758 $340.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less