This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:23:11 (UTC).

LI-V-SCHMIDT/CASTRO/TARANGO

Case Summary

On 02/17/2017 LI-V-SCHMIDT/CASTRO/TARANGO was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0054

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFF LI

Defendants

KYLE SCHMIDT

DESIREE CASTRO

ERIKA TARANGO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/17/2017 OF JEFF LI GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFF LI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KYLE SCHMIDT, DESIREE CASTRO, ERIKA TARANGO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,650.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $915.00 COSTS $650.00 AND DAMAGES $801.42.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10,016.42; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JEFF LI.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JEFF LI.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE AGREEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE AGREEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED * FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED * FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3-13-17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3-13-17)

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/17/2017 OF JEFF LI ORDERED ENTERED 03/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFF LI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KYLE SCHMIDT, DESIREE CASTRO, ERIKA TARANGO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KYLE SCHMIDT, DESIREE CASTRO, ERIKA TARANGO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KYLE SCHMIDT, DESIREE CASTRO, ERIKA TARANGO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KYLE SCHMIDT, DESIREE CASTRO, ERIKA TARANGO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO DESIREE CASTRO SERVED ON 02/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO DESIREE CASTRO SERVED ON 02/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ERIKA TARANGO SERVED ON 02/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ERIKA TARANGO SERVED ON 02/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KYLE SCHMIDT SERVED ON 02/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KYLE SCHMIDT SERVED ON 02/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/17/2017 OF JEFF LI GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFF LI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KYLE SCHMIDT, DESIREE CASTRO, ERIKA TARANGO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,650.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $915.00 COSTS $650.00 AND DAMAGES $801.42.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10,016.42; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JEFF LI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST LEASE AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED * FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170314-0609 $25.00; 170314-0609-CK Reference Number 1168442

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3-13-17)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO DESIREE CASTRO SERVED ON 02/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ERIKA TARANGO SERVED ON 02/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KYLE SCHMIDT SERVED ON 02/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/17/2017 OF JEFF LI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JEFF LI FOR NEW FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170222-0214 $255.00; 170222-0214-CK Reference Number 1166722

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • ADA LETTERS MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less