This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 23:12:02 (UTC).

LESEMAN -V- DESERT MEDICAL GROUP

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 LESEMAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DESERT MEDICAL GROUP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tomberlin, John M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0587

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Tomberlin, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLYSON LESEMAN

Defendants

HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK, INC

DESERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC

Not Classified By Court

DESERT OASIS HEALTHCARE

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALIANT LAW

4150 Concours Street Suite 260

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

07/22/2020: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING FILED BY DESERT MEDICA

06/23/2020: NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING FILED BY DESERT MEDICA

DECLARATION RE- TED H. GEHRING IN SUPPORT OF DEF M

06/03/2020: DECLARATION RE- TED H. GEHRING IN SUPPORT OF DEF M

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS OF AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF

06/03/2020: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS OF AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF

DECLARATION RE- S. STONE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS

06/03/2020: DECLARATION RE- S. STONE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS

DECLARATION RE- M. TRUJILLO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDAN

06/03/2020: DECLARATION RE- M. TRUJILLO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDAN

DECLARATION RE- S.SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS M

06/03/2020: DECLARATION RE- S.SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS M

DECLARATION RE- M.DEERING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS

06/03/2020: DECLARATION RE- M.DEERING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS

DEFENDANTS SEPERATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FI

06/03/2020: DEFENDANTS SEPERATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FI

MOTION RE- SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DESERT MEDICA

06/03/2020: MOTION RE- SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DESERT MEDICA

NOTICE IMAGED

05/22/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

ANSWER FILED BY DESERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC, HERITAG

09/12/2019: ANSWER FILED BY DESERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC, HERITAG

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

09/09/2019: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ALLYSON LESEM

09/06/2019: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ALLYSON LESEM

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE-DEMURRER SET FOR

07/25/2019: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE-DEMURRER SET FOR

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED

07/19/2019: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED

DEMURRER FILED BY DESERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC, HERIT

07/01/2019: DEMURRER FILED BY DESERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC, HERIT

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESP

06/18/2019: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESP

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Original Type: Readiness Calendar; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (6/3/20) FILED BY DEFENDANT DESERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC, HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMotion Re:; Original Type: Motion Re:; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (6/3/20) FILED BY DEFENDANT DESERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC, HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $2,240.50; Total Payments and Credits: $2,240.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF ALLYSON LESEMAN FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY ALLYSON LESEMAN FOR 1ST APP FEES 190108-0558-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 190108-0558-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 45692

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Desert Medical Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where DESERT OASIS HEALTHCARE is a litigant

Latest cases where HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK INC. is a litigant