This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 00:48:47 (UTC).

LEROY -V- CHINO VALLEY USD, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/11/2016 LEROY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHINO VALLEY USD. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5318

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAULA LEROY

CHRISTOPHER LEROY

Defendants

GARY DAY AND LYNN DAY, A MARRIED COUPLE

DIANA YARBOI

CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL MINOR

GARY DAY

CARLO A PURTHER

CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A

LYNN DAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARTZBERG & LUTHER

8291 Utica Avenue Suite 201

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant Attorneys

THOMPSON & COLEGATE

3610 14Th St. P.O. Box 1299

Riverside, CA 92502

HANGER, STEINBERG,SHAPIRO & ASH

21031 Ventura Blvd Suite 800

Woodland Hills, CA 91364-6512

 

Court Documents

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND REFERENCE SUPPORTING EVIDENCE FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND REFERENCE SUPPORTING EVIDENCE FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND REFERENCE SUPPORTING EVIDENCE FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND REFERENCE SUPPORTING EVIDENCE FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIM SET FOR HEARING ON 08/04/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAULA LEROY, CHRISTOPHER LEROY (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIM SET FOR HEARING ON 08/04/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAULA LEROY, CHRISTOPHER LEROY (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BY MAIL ON 05/24/16 AS TO SEE SERVICE LISTING, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BY MAIL ON 05/24/16 AS TO SEE SERVICE LISTING, FILED.

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER LEROY FILED

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER LEROY FILED

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DIANA YARBOI

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DIANA YARBOI

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY M.D., AN INDIVIDUALMINOR, LYNN DAY, GARY DAY.

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY M.D., AN INDIVIDUALMINOR, LYNN DAY, GARY DAY.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO DIANA YARBOI, CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A, LYNN DAY, GARY DAY. PARTY SERVED ON 10/10/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO DIANA YARBOI, CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A, LYNN DAY, GARY DAY. PARTY SERVED ON 10/10/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DIANA YARBOI, CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A, CARLO A PURTHER.

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DIANA YARBOI, CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A, CARLO A PURTHER.

ORDER, PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/IMMEDIATE STAY DENIED PLACED IN FILE

ORDER, PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/IMMEDIATE STAY DENIED PLACED IN FILE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO CARLO A PURTHER. PARTY SERVED ON 09/26/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT/MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO CARLO A PURTHER. PARTY SERVED ON 09/26/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT/MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 08/11/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAULA LEROY, CHRISTOPHER LEROY (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 08/11/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAULA LEROY, CHRISTOPHER LEROY (IMAGED)

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF PAULA LEROY

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF PAULA LEROY

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DECLARATION OF GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET & CONFER

DECLARATION OF GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET & CONFER

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

INDEX OF EXHIBITS AND EXHIBITS ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /OR/ SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED.

INDEX OF EXHIBITS AND EXHIBITS ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /OR/ SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; THE NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS. THE FORM; POS-015 NEEDS TO BE ACCOMPANIED BY THE POS -010. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS PLEASE CALL 1 909 708; 8678. THANK YOU

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • MOTION RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/OR/SUMMARY ADJUDICATIO (9-4-18) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIANA YARBOI, CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A, CARLO A PURTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT DIANA YARBOI, CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A, CARLO A PURTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT M.D., AN INDIVIDUALMINOR, LYNN DAY, GARY DAY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SAGI SCHWARTZBERG PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY LISA TODD PRESENT FOR DIANA YARBOI/CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED/CARLO PURTHER.; ATTORNEY JUSTIN RUEDAFLORES APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR M.D., AN INDIVIDUALMINOR, LYNN DAY, GARY DAY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFF INDICATES THE MATTER SETTLED AT MEDIATION AS TO THE DAY DEFENDANTS ONLY. THE; COURT VACATES THE MSJ ON CALENDAR FOR 10/10/18 SINCE THE DAY DEFENDANTS HAVE BEEN DISMISSED.; COUNSEL FOR THE REMAINING DEFENDANTS INDICATES THEY CURRENTLY HAVE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY; JUDGMENT ON CALENDAR FOR 12/5/18, 12/6/18 AND REQUEST THE COURT SET A HEARING DATE OF 12/7/18; FOR A THIRD MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; COUNSEL FOR THE DAY DEFENDANTS WILL BE FILING A MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT.; PLAINTIFF AND THE REMAINING DEFENDANTS WILL CONTINUE THEIR DISCUSSIONS REGARDING DISMISSING; SOME OF THE CAUSES OF ACTION.; HEARINGS:; VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; HEARING DATE OF 12/05/18 CONFIRMED.; HEARING DATE OF 12/06/18 CONFIRMED.; LAW & MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR 12/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S25.; COUNSEL FOR YARBOI/CHINO VALLEY/PURTHER TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO M.D., AN INDIVIDUALMINOR, LYNN DAY, GARY DAY, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • INDEX OF EXHIBITS AND EXHIBITS ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /OR/ SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF LISA V. TODD ISO MSJ / OR / MSA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /OR/ SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO M.D., AN INDIVIDUALMINOR SERVED ON 04/20/16 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/18/16 WITH COSTS OF $66.60 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/11/2016 OF PAULA LEROY, LYNN DAY, GARY DAY IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/11/2016 OF PAULA LEROY, CHINO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER LEROY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160411-0358 $435.00; 160411-0358-VS Reference Number 023-0254750852

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.