This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:34:57 (UTC).

LEOS VS HOLLE

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 LEOS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOLLE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8333

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAYCE R LEOS

Defendant

ANTHONY R HOLLE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CAYCE R LEOS PRESENT; DEFENDANT ANTHONY R HOLLE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:53; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER BRENDA ROBERTS IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SIGN LANGUAGE/ENGLISH FOR SIGN LANGUAGE. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER 400029 HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; THE INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; SMCFS1708333 & SMCFS1708335 HEARD AT THE SAME TIME DUE TO CASES ARISING FROM THE SAME AUTO; ACCIDENT.; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- RICHARD PEREZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- CAYCE LEOS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- ANTHONY HOLLE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; 11:15; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CAYCE R LEOS PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY R HOLLE; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:21; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: SERVE DEFENDANT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/08/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 10:22; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0080 $75.00; 171031-0080-EZ Reference Number 16Y701541G343433

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/21/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DEFENDANT PICKED UP EXHIBITS, ID VERIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANTHONY R HOLLE FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 180215-0631 $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAYCE LEOS ORDERED ENTERED 02/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT ANTHONY R HOLLE; AND AGAINST CAYCE R LEOS; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CAYCE R LEOS PRESENT; DEFENDANT ANTHONY R HOLLE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:53; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER BRENDA ROBERTS IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SIGN LANGUAGE/ENGLISH FOR SIGN LANGUAGE. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER 400029 HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; THE INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; SMCFS1708333 & SMCFS1708335 HEARD AT THE SAME TIME DUE TO CASES ARISING FROM THE SAME AUTO; ACCIDENT.; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- RICHARD PEREZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- CAYCE LEOS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- ANTHONY HOLLE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; 11:15; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CAYCE R LEOS PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY R HOLLE; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:21; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: SERVE DEFENDANT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/08/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 10:22; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0080 $75.00; 171031-0080-EZ Reference Number 16Y701541G343433

    Read MoreRead Less