This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:41:06 (UTC).

LENA MAY MOUNT

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 LENA MAY MOUNT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1252

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARMON MOUNT

Decedent

LENA MAY MOUNT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MATSEN VOORHEES MINTZ, LLP

695 Town Center Drive Ste 700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

HRG OF 02/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

DECLARATION RE: AMENDED ORDER FILED BY ARMON MOUNT

DECLARATION RE: AMENDED ORDER FILED BY ARMON MOUNT

DECLARATION RE: AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION FILED BY ARMON MOUNT

DECLARATION RE: AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION FILED BY ARMON MOUNT

ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170608-0561 $30.50; 170608-0561-CK Reference Number 111734

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON AMENDED ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: AMENDED ORDER FILED BY ARMON MOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PROPERTY DESCRIPTION (ATTACHMENT 9) IS NOT ATTACHED AS INDICAT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION FILED BY ARMON MOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION (AMENDED) RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DECLARATION RE AMENDED ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): AMENDED ORDER MAY NOT BE ATTACHED TO DECLARATION AS AN EXHIBIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROP RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BLAINE BURCH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ARMON MOUNT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 12/20/2016 OF ARMON MOUNT IS GRANTED; COUNSEL TO PREPARE ORDER.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 12/20/2016 OF ARMON MOUNT ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ARMON MOUNT FOR PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCC; Minutes; Receipt: 161220-0259 $465.00; 161220-0259-CK Reference Number 111614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.