This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 09:37:29 (UTC).

LEE/SALAZAR VS BOLTON

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 LEE/SALAZAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOLTON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5511

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEEANNA LEE

ALFREDO SALAZAR

Defendants

MARC BOLTON

BOLTON GENERAL CONTRACTING

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0419 $75.00; 170711-0419-DB Reference Number 031-0026305003

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2018
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; JAY H ROBINSON, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; COURT ATTENDANT M EVANS; MINUTES UPDATED BY ASHLEY DAWSON; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JEEANNA LEE, ALFREDO SALAZAR, BOLTON GENERAL CONTRACTING, MARC BOLTON; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: POS WAS REJECTED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANT NAME DOES NOT MATCH CLAIM. INCLUDE DBA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED AT COUNTER ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JEEANNA LEE FOR WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JEEANNA LEE FOR ORAP IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JEEANNA LEE FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 10/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • STIPULATION RE: PAYMENTS FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BOLTON GENERAL CONTRACTING FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; GUY BOVEE, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: LOU GUEVARA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JEEANNA LEE, ALFREDO SALAZAR PRESENT; DEFENDANT BOLTON GENERAL CONTRACTING, MARC BOLTON PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS SETTLED.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:59; BOLTON GENERAL CONTRACTING REPRESENTED BY MARC BOLTON.; AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: JEEANNA LEE, ALFREDO SALAZAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BOLTON GENERAL CONTRACTING, MARC BOLTON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,000.00; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $500.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 12/15/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 15TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; WITH NO PAYMENT BEING MORE THAN 5 DAYS LATE.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; CLAIM TO TAKE EFFECT ON 12/15/17 IF AND ONLY IF INSURANCE/BOND DOES NOT PAY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 11:01; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARC BOLTON. PARTY SERVED ON 10/01/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JEEANNA LEE FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0421 $2.50; 170711-0421-DB Reference Number 031-0026305003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0419 $75.00; 170711-0419-DB Reference Number 031-0026305003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less