This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:54:12 (UTC).

Leebertha Alisa Rogers

Case Summary

On 12/27/2016 Leebertha Alisa Rogers was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1279

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EVANS LOUIS ROGERS Jr

Decedent

LEEBERTHA ALISA ROGERS

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 07/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA FILED.

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF $148,599.05 FILED.

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF $148,599.05 FILED.

HRG OF 12/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

MAILING COVERSHEET 12/14/17 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

MAILING COVERSHEET 12/14/17 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $148,599.05.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $148,599.05.

HRG OF 03/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY EVANS LOUIS ROGERS JR

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY EVANS LOUIS ROGERS JR

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY EVANS LOUIS ROGERS JR

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY EVANS LOUIS ROGERS JR

MAILING COVER SHEET FOR MINUTE ORDER DATED 7/27/17 TO EVAN LOUIS ROGERS JR. (IMAGED)

MAILING COVER SHEET FOR MINUTE ORDER DATED 7/27/17 TO EVAN LOUIS ROGERS JR. (IMAGED)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON-APPEARANCE OF MOVING PARTY.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN. W/ FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA.; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PETITION DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF BOND; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PETITION DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: 12/14/17 MINUTE ORDER TO EVANS LOUIS ROGERS JR RECEIVED BACK FROM US MAIL-RETURN TO SENDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVERSHEET 12/14/17 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN. W/ FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; 08:49; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF THE COURT.; REASON: FOR PETITIONER TO BE PRESENT; PETITIONER TO POST BOND AND PROVIDE COURT; WITH PROOF OF PUBLICATION; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL SET FOR 03/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF TODAYS MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF BOND; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; 08:49; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: SEE OTHER MINUTE ORDER THIS DATE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 12/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON EVANS LOUIS ROGERS JR FOR PET FOR PROBATE IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY EVANS LOUIS ROGERS JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY EVANS LOUIS ROGERS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.