This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:31:38 (UTC).

LEE VS DIGGS/SAPIEN

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 LEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIGGS/SAPIEN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8321

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT LEE (BLA)

Defendants

DENISE DIGGS

DAISY SAPIEN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DAISY SAPIEN. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DAISY SAPIEN. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0124 $75.00; 171030-0124-VS Reference Number 031-0055461053

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DENISE DIGGS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DENISE DIGGS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: LEVORA JOSEPH; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROBERT LEE (BLA), DENISE DIGGS, DAISY SAPIEN; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY MOVING PARTY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ROBERT LEE (BLA) PRESENT; DEFENDANT DENISE DIGGS, DAISY SAPIEN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; PLAINTIFF STATES THAT BLA IS HIS BUSINESS WHICH IS A LLC; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF BOTH PARTIES.; REASON: FOR SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/15/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F2.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DENISE DIGGS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DAISY SAPIEN. PARTY SERVED ON 11/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT LEE (BLA) FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0137 $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0124 $75.00; 171030-0124-VS Reference Number 031-0055461053

    Read MoreRead Less