This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 05:40:43 (UTC).

LEE V GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 LEE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1690

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AI-JU LIN LEE

Defendant

LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ

Other

ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT FWD TO S.C.S. W/INSTRUCTIONS)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT FWD TO S.C.S. W/INSTRUCTIONS); Minutes; Receipt: 170815-0127 $25.00; 170815-0127-CK Reference Number 1048

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/21/2017 OF AI-JU LEE ORDERED ENTERED 08/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: AI-JU LIN LEE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION ON 07/21/17 WITH FEES OF $10.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION ON 07/21/17 WITH FEES OF $10.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 07/21/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 07/21/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0263 $255.00; 170721-0263-CK Reference Number 1037

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT FWD TO S.C.S. W/INSTRUCTIONS); Minutes; Receipt: 170815-0127 $25.00; 170815-0127-CK Reference Number 1048

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • PARTY ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION UPDATED: UNKNOWNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/21/2017 OF AI-JU LEE ORDERED ENTERED 08/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: AI-JU LIN LEE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/21/2017 OF AI-JU LEE AS TO LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/21/2017 OF AI-JU LEE, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 07/21/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM LINDA MARIE GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,800.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $46.67.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0263 $255.00; 170721-0263-CK Reference Number 1037

    Read MoreRead Less