This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 22:42:35 (UTC).

LEDFORD -V- HARWOOD HOMES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 LEDFORD filed an Other lawsuit against HARWOOD HOMES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5770

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MARIA LEDFORD

MARIA LEDFORD TRUST

GOLDY BERGER

MARK BERNIER

BRICE CHAMBERS

KIM OANH DAO

ERICKA PENIX

DUNG (DAVID) NGUYEN

THO NGUYEN

CYNDI SALDANA

CHRIS CHAMBERS

ANH TRAC

SHARON WARD

DAPHNE ZAMORA

SARAH CHAMBERS

ZOEY CHAMBERS

JAMES BARNES

JOSEPH PENIX

TYLER PENIX

JACOB RYAN SALDANA

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

ERICKA PENIX

CYNDI SALDANA

CHRIS CHAMBERS

Plaintiffs and Minors

BRICE CHAMBERS

ZOEY CHAMBERS

TYLER PENIX

JACOB RYAN SALDANA

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

WASSERMAN, COMDEN,CASSELMAN &PEARSON, LLP

5567 Reseda Boulevard, Ste 330 Po Box 7033

Tarzana, CA 91357-7033

WASSERMAN, COMDEN & CASSELMAN

5567 Reseda Blvd Ste #330 P.O. Box 7033

Tarzana, CA 91357-7033

WASSERMAN,COMDEN,CASSELMAN & ESENSTEN

5567 Reseda Blvd Suite 330 Po Box 7033

Tarzana, CA 91357-7033

WASSERMAN,COMDEN &CASSELMAN,LLP

5567 Reseda Blvd Suite 330 P.O Box 7033

Tarzana, CA 91357-7033

EUM, DAVID

100 West Broadway Ste 1150

Glendale, CA 91210

HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

P.O. Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

CUMMINGS, THOMAS B

1900 S. State College Blvd. Suite 505

Anaheim, CA 92806

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WASSERMAN,COMDEN &CASSELMAN,LLP

5567 Reseda Blvd Suite 330 P.O Box 7033

Tarzana, CA 91357-7033

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF VIVIAN L SCHWARTZ

P.O Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 Town Center Dr., Ste. 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR & STEWART

1100 El Centro Street

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2014
  • VACATE OSCVF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 09/25/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24J.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 09/25/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24J.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 09/25/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 09/25/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24J.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM MAILING ADDRESS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ORIGINAL SIGNATURE REQUIRED ON DOCUMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • VACATE OSCVF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • VACATE OSCVF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
314 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JAMES R EVANS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/02/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THATCHER ENGINEERING & ASSOCIATES INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/11/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • CERTIFICATE OF MERIT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF MARIA LEDFORD, KIM OANH DAO, ERICKA PENIX, DUNG (DAVID) NGUYEN, THO NGUYEN, CYNDI SALDANA, ANH TRAC, SHARON WARD, DAPHNEZAMORA IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF MARIA LEDFORD, MARK BERNIER, BRICE CHAMBERS IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-0231 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF MARIA LEDFORD - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less