This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 08:54:39 (UTC).

LECHNER -V- JOHNSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/26/2012 LECHNER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHNSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0536

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRENDA LECHNER

JOSEPH LECHNER

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PHILLIP HARVEY JOHNSON

PHILLIP JOHNSON CONSTRUCTION INC

MARK GRINDLE

DANIEL JOSEPH CONNER

D.J. CONNER, INC.

INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

KATHRYN LYNN CONNER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

, B. PALMER RIEDEL

29069 Isleta Ct.

Cathedral City, CA 92234

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LOBB & CLIFF

1650 Spruce Street Suite 410

Riverside, CA 92507

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2014
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY, WITH PREJUDICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • ORDER TO VACATE STIPUALTION FOR JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT FILED 100413 AND ALLOW DISMISSAL OF ACTION FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF BRENDA LECHNER ORDERED SET ASIDE.; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF BRENDA LECHNER, JOSEPH LECHNER SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT PHILLIP HARVEY JOHNSON, PHILLIP JOHNSON CONSTRUCTION INC, INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF BRENDA LECHNER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • DISPOSITION; Minutes; COMPLAINT DISPOSITIONED BY JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DECLARATION OF B. PALMER RIEDEL TO VACATE THE STIP FOR JUDGMENT F FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE CASE WAS DISMISSED ON 032514 WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THESE DEFENDANTS WERE DISMISSED ON 03/25/14 THERE WAS NOT A JUDGMENT AGAINST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THIS CASE WAS DISMISSED ON 03/25/14 .

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2012
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA SERVED ON 10/30/12 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 120926-0169 $0.67; 120926-0169-VS Reference Number 025-0045945339

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • ADA MEMO SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 120926-0167 $77.50; 120926-0167-VS Reference Number 025-0045945339

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 120926-0161 $435.00; 120926-0161-VS Reference Number 025-0045945339

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.