This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 12:47:46 (UTC).

LBS FINANCIAL-V-GANJAI

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 LBS FINANCIAL-V-GANJAI was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1243

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LBS FINANCIAL CU

Defendant

JENNIFER R GANJAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE

2122 N Broadway Ste 200

Santa Ana, CA 927062614

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: ADMITTING A COPY OF CONTRACT INTO EVIDENCE FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: ADMITTING A COPY OF CONTRACT INTO EVIDENCE FILED.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF LBS FINANCIAL CU FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF LBS FINANCIAL CU FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF LBS FINANCIAL CU ORDERED ENTERED 01/03/18; JUDGMENT FOR: LBS FINANCIAL CU; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JENNIFER R GANJAI; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,201.18 INTEREST $54.18 ATTORNEY FEES $870.11 COSTS $345.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8,470.47; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF LBS FINANCIAL CU AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF LBS FINANCIAL CU AS TO DOES ONLY

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JENNIFER R GANJAI FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JENNIFER R GANJAI FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 8930.87 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LBS FINANCIAL CU FOR SB WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 180322-0529 $25.00; 180322-0529-CK Reference Number 24562

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ON WRIT LINE 3 IS MISSING NAME OF JUDGMENT CREDITO R PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $339.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $96.40)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180213-0786 $25.00; 180213-0786-CK Reference Number 24506

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LBS FINANCIAL CU FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180119-0705 $25.00; 180119-0705-CK Reference Number 6899

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JENNIFER R GANJAI SERVED ON 11/10/17 WITH FEES OF $105.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF LBS FINANCIAL CU FOR JENNIFER R GANJAI, ADD JENNIFER R GANJAI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LBS FINANCIAL CU FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0092 $240.00; 171030-0092-CK Reference Number 23889

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less