Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 10:38:54 (UTC).

LAURA STRIEBY - CHRISTOPHER STRIEBY

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 LAURA STRIEBY - CHRISTOPHER STRIEBY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5295

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAURA STRIEBY

Respondent

CHRISTIPHER STRIEBY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ORDERS FOR CHILD CUSTODY/CHILD VISITATION/ CHILD SUPPORT NEED TO BE INCORPORATED INTO JMT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CHRISTIPHER STRIEBY FOR PRELIM/WAIVE FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LAURA STRIEBY FOR PRELIM/WAIVE FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON CHRISTIPHER STRIEBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT PACKET IS BEING RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: MISSING FL-141 FOR; PRELIMINARY FROM THE RESPONDENT, ON FL-170 NEED TO COMPLETE ITEM 7B AND 7C AND YOU ALSO NEED TO; ADDRESS SPOUSAL SUPPORT FOR THE RESPONDENT, ON FL-180 YOU MARKED THE BOX FOR DISSOLUTION AND; STATUS ONLY, NEEDONLY 1-ON FL-190 ON THE BOTTOM OF THE FORM YOU NEED TO SWITCH NAMES AND; ADDRESSES AROUND -YOUR ARE THE PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF JUDGMENT RETURNED BY THE COURT SENT.; Minutes; FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: INCOMPLETE FORMS PLEASE CORRECT BEFORE RESUBMITING. PETITIONERS; FL-141 MISSING #2 DATE AND TYPE OF SERVICE PERSONAL OR MAIL?? REVIEW FL-170 #8 ADDRESS; SPOUSAL SUPPORT FOR BOTH PARTIES. FL-180 NEED TO ADDRESS CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, SUPPORT; IN ADDITION TO SPOUSAL SUPPORT, AND PROPERTY DIVISION. FL-190 REQUIRES BOTH; PARTIES ADDRESSES AND TYPE OF PRO- CEEDINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LAURA STRIEBY FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170822-0702 $13.20

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHRISTIPHER STRIEBY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF LAURA STRIEBY IS DENIED.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LAURA STRIEBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LAURA STRIEBY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less