This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 14:09:47 (UTC).

LAURA J MARTINEZ -V- ROBERT R MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 09/13/2017 LAURA J MARTINEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBERT R MARTINEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2880

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAURA J MARTINEZ

Respondent

ROBERT R MARTINEZ

Others

ROBERT MARTINEZ

LAURA MARTINEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY LAURA MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180828-0462 $10.00; 180828-0462-DB Reference Number 031-0141749854

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION) FILED BY LAURA MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • TRODV-110 DENIED (082118)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION)FILED BY LAURA MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TEMP DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; SHANNON SUBER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: EBONY SHAW; NOT REPORTED; BAILIFF: C MORRIS; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LAURA J MARTINEZ, ROBERT R MARTINEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; LAURA MARTINEZ'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: EX PARTE RE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE TRO IS HEARD; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; (SAME DAY); COURT FINDS:; NO EMERGENCY - SET FOR HEARING ONLY; EX PARTE ORDERS ARE DENIED.; EX PARTE ORDER SIGNED BY THE COURT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING IS SET FOR 09/14/2018 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT V14.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY LAURA MARTINEZ.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • ROAH * PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • EX PARTE RE: TEMP DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY LAURA MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR ORDER ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY LAURA J MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • PAYMENT ON FEE WAIVER FOR 1ST PAPER FEES PAID BY LAURA J MARTINEZ IN THE AMOUNT OF $217.50.; Minutes; Receipt: 171117-0363 $217.50; 171117-0363-DB Reference Number 031-0061045716

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ROBERT R MARTINEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/15/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF LAURA J MARTINEZ IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LAURA J MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.