This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 04/27/2018 at 19:01:35 (UTC).

LARICH -V- JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 LARICH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHNSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0037

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOMENIC LARICH

Respondent

TY JOHNSON

Other

ALL UKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT COUNTER)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TY JOHNSON, ALL UKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TY JOHNSON, ALL UKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 OF DOMENIC LARICH ORDERED ENTERED 03/21/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DOMENIC LARICH; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TY JOHNSON; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TY JOHNSON. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/02/18 WITH FEES OF $81.83.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/02/18 WITH FEES OF $81.83.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON TY JOHNSON; POSTED ON 03/02/18 WITH FEES OF $121.83.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON TY JOHNSON; POSTED ON 03/02/18 WITH FEES OF $121.83.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF DOMENIC LARICH

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF DOMENIC LARICH

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180207-0568 $255.00; 180207-0568-EZ Reference Number BPOPF2EDC1F1

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180321-0680 $25.00; 180321-0680-CK Reference Number 10648

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $33.33.--BEGINNING ON 03/01/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TY JOHNSON, ALL UKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF DOMENIC LARICH AS TO TY JOHNSON, ALL UKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 OF DOMENIC LARICH ORDERED ENTERED 03/21/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DOMENIC LARICH; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TY JOHNSON; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TY JOHNSON. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180301-0557 $24.00; 180301-0557-VS Reference Number 026-0096356770

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180213-0292 $52.50; 180213-0292-VS Reference Number 026-0093446988

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF DOMENIC LARICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • ADA MEMO SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180207-0568 $255.00; 180207-0568-EZ Reference Number BPOPF2EDC1F1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.