This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:21:23 (UTC).

LANON JR VS FRANKLIN SR

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 LANON JR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRANKLIN SR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7490

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEVERO LANON JR

Defendant

ROBERT FRANKLIN SR

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT FRANKLIN SR. PARTY SERVED ON 10/18/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT FRANKLIN SR. PARTY SERVED ON 10/18/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:55; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF SEVERO LANON JR PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROBERT FRANKLIN SR; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ROBERT FRANKLIN SR HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- SEVERO LANON JR. IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 09/27/2017 OF SEVERO LANON ORDERED ENTERED 12/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT ROBERT FRANKLIN SR; AND AGAINST SEVERO LANON JR; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 11:08; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT FRANKLIN SR. PARTY SERVED ON 10/18/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SEVERO LANON JR IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SEVERO LANON JR FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SEVERO LANON JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less