This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 17:02:04 (UTC).

LAMPKIN VS EQUIFAX

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 LAMPKIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EQUIFAX. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7151

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D'ANDRE LAMPKIN

Defendant

EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: D'ANDRE LAMPKIN; EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY PAMELA SMITH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:00; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF.; 11:00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC; PARTY SERVED ON 09/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC; PARTY SERVED ON 09/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0530 $75.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: D'ANDRE LAMPKIN; EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY PAMELA SMITH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:00; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF.; 11:00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF D'ANDRE LAMPKIN PRESENT; EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY NADIA REYNAGA-MORENO.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT.; REASON: FOR SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/18/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • POS - SIGNED RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO EQUIFAX CREDIT INFORMATION SERVICES INC; PARTY SERVED ON 09/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0534 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0530 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less