This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/13/2018 at 14:37:05 (UTC).

LAKISHA NEAL-CHATMAN -N- ALFRED LEE CHATMAN SR

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 LAKISHA NEAL-CHATMAN -N- ALFRED LEE CHATMAN SR was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0233

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAKISHA NEAL-CHATMAN

Respondent

ALFRED LEE CHATMAN SR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2015
  • CLERK'S OFFICE RETURNED PROOF OF SERVICE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: CASE DISMISSED ON 01/07/15. *.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; ALEXANDER R MARTINEZ, JUDGE; CLERK: REBECCA J. NAJAR; COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS 7776; BAILIFF: BEN PEDROZA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LAKISHA NEAL-CHATMAN, ALFRED LEE CHATMAN SR; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION --DISMISSAL LACK OF PROSECUTION (FL); DISPOSITION DISMISSAL LACK OF PROSECUTION (FL); ON COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCES/NO SERVICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • RETURN MAIL: CLERKS NOTICE OF HEARING RE: DISMISSAL RECEIVED BACK FROM LAKISHA NEAL-CHATMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • HRG RE: DISMISSAL (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: DISMISSAL SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THIS CASE HAS BEEN SET FOR HEARING RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO BRING; MATTER TO RESOLUTION WITHIN 3-5 YEARS. HEARING SET FOR 1-7-2015 DEPARTMENT V12 AT 8:30AM.; FAILURE TO APPEAR MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF YOUR CASE. NO OTHER NOTICE WILL BE SENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • REJECT NTC AND DOCS MAILED BACK TO PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): STILL MISSING FL-117 NTC AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT.NEED CORRECT SERVICE DATES..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED TO VICTORVILLE DISTRICT FOR ALL PURPOSES EFFECTIVE MAY 6,2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF LAKISHA NEAL-CHATMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LAKISHA NEAL-CHATMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LAKISHA NEAL-CHATMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY LAKISHA NEAL-CHATMAN IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LAKISHA NEAL-CHATMAN FOR PETITION IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less