This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 15:22:35 (UTC).

LAIEWSKI -V- PAT N PAT

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 LAIEWSKI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAT N PAT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0985

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTHONY J LAIEWSKI

KELLY S LAIEWSKI

Defendant

PAT N PAT, INC

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO PAT N PAT, INC; PARTY SERVED ON 02/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO PAT N PAT, INC; PARTY SERVED ON 02/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; SUSAN F SLATER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: SHERRI SIMPSON; BAILIFF: LOU GUEVERA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ANTHONY J LAIEWSKI, KELLY S LAIEWSKI PRESENT; PAT N PAT, INC REPRESENTED BY PAT & STACEY PATTISON.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SC109 FILED.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:07; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- ANTHONY LAIEWSKI IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- KELLY LAIEWSKI IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- STACEY PATTISON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- PAT PATTISON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; 11:43; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; FOLLOWING ORAL ARGUMENT BY BOTH PARTIES, COURT TAKES CASE UNDER SUBMISSION.; LATER; RULING NOT RECORDED; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT:; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/31/2017 OF ANTHONY LAIEWSKI ORDERED ENTERED 04/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT PAT N PAT, INC; AND AGAINST ANTHONY J LAIEWSKI, KELLY S LAIEWSKI; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO PAT N PAT, INC. PARTY SERVED ON 03/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • ** VOID ** SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY MAIL SB75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • SIGNED POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO PAT N PAT, INC; PARTY SERVED ON 02/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • TRACKING # 9590 9402 1962 6123 9414 62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 170203-0685 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 170203-0686 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 2HB76730H9817854V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • TRACKING # 7012 1010 0000 4535 4098

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170203-0674 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.