This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 13:44:26 (UTC).

LAGUNAS -V- PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY

Case Summary

On 02/27/2017 LAGUNAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3395

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HENRY LAGUNAS

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

DOE 6, DOE 7, DOE 8, DOE 9 ANDDOE 10

DOE 11, DOE 12, DOE 13, DOE 14AND DOE 15

J & G MACHINERY, INC.

PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP, INC.

DOE 1, DOE 2, DOE 3, DOE 4 ANDDOE 5

MACHINERYMAX .COM

J & G MACHINERY, INC

PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP

MACHINERYMAX, INC.

J & G MACHINERY

PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP INC

Intervenor and Plaintiff

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

SANCOR WOODWORKS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorneys

THE DERUBERTIS LAWFIRM

4219 Coldwater Canyon Avenue

Studio City, CA 91604

THE RUDMAN LAW FIRM PLC

15760 Ventura Blvd. Suite 1010

Encino, CA 91436

SMITH & SUSSON LLP

2 Corporate Plaza Suite 275

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

ERICKSEN ARBUTHNOT

152 North Third Street Suite 700

San Jose, CA 95112

GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

777 S Figueroa Street Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90017

GORDON & REES LLP

101 West Broadway Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP

101 W Broadway Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorney

MIRAU, EDWARDS, CANNON, LEWIN & TOOKE

P.O. Box 9058

Redlands, CA 92375

 

Court Documents

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY MACHINERYMAX, INC..

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY MACHINERYMAX, INC..

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPEC INTERROGS SET FOR HEARING ON 08/01/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP, INC. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPEC INTERROGS SET FOR HEARING ON 08/01/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP, INC. (IMAGED)

SEPERATE STATEMENT FILED.

SEPERATE STATEMENT FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO MACHINERYMAX .COM, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO MACHINERYMAX .COM, WITH PREJUDICE

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPEC INTERROGS SET FOR HEARING ON 08/01/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP, INC. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPEC INTERROGS SET FOR HEARING ON 08/01/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP, INC. (IMAGED)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO MACHINERYMAX .COM, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO MACHINERYMAX .COM, WITH PREJUDICE

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY MACHINERYMAX, INC..

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY MACHINERYMAX, INC..

SEPERATE STATEMENT FILED.

SEPERATE STATEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION OF LISA P. GRUEN IN SUPP OF MTN FOR MSJ FILED

DECLARATION OF LISA P. GRUEN IN SUPP OF MTN FOR MSJ FILED

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS FILED.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON J & G MACHINERY, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON J & G MACHINERY, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP, INC.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP, INC.

OBJECTION TO IN SUPPORT OF PLAS OPPOSITION TO MSJ FILED BY HENRY LAGUNAS

OBJECTION TO IN SUPPORT OF PLAS OPPOSITION TO MSJ FILED BY HENRY LAGUNAS

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

MEMO OF P&AS IN SUPPORT OF EX-PARTE - FILED.

MEMO OF P&AS IN SUPPORT OF EX-PARTE - FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY MACHINERYMAX, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GORDON & REES LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY MACHINERYMAX, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GORDON & REES LLP.

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY.

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY.

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES FILED

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES FILED

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL DEF FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPEC INTERROGS (07/01/19) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HENRY LAGUNAS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • STIP TO CONTINUE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): HEARINGS REQUEST TO BE CONTINUED WERE VACATED AT 8/8/19 HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL RESPONCES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ANNA LISA KNAFO PRESENT FOR HENRY LAGUNAS.; ATTORNEY KENNETH PERRI PRESENT FOR PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; HENRY LAGUNAS'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES IS HEARD.; THE COURTS TENTATIVE RULING IS RECITED INTO THE RECORD.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; AFTER ARGUMENT,; COURT FINDS:; THE MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE COURT DENIES THE MOTION AS TO SPECIAL; INTERROGATORIES NO.S 229, 230, 233, 234, AND 235 AS OVERBROAD.; NO SANCTIONS AWARDED.; DEFENDANT ORDER TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES WITHIN 10 DAYS.; COUNSEL STIPULATE TO CONTINUE THE PENDING TRIAL READINESS AND TRIAL DATES. THE STIPULATION DOES; NOT EXTEND THE DISCOVERY CUT OFF EXCLUDING THE EXPERT DEPOSITIONS DISCUSSED.; HEARINGS:; VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/09/19 AT 11:00 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 01/23/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/27/20 AT 11:00 IN DEPARTMENT S26 ESTIMATED DURATION OF - DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • MOTION RE: COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES SPECIAL INTERROGS (PLA); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • VACATE LM37 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PROFESSIONAL MACHINERY GROUP, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/27/2017 OF HENRY LAGUNAS, J & G MACHINERY, INC., DOE 11, DOE 12, DOE13, DOE 14AND DOE 15 IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF HENRY LAGUNAS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HENRY LAGUNAS FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170227-0656 $435.00; 170227-0656-CK Reference Number CK 147276

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.