This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/29/2018 at 02:58:55 (UTC).

LACY v V.V. TOW INC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 LACY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against V. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2593

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNNY R LACY

Defendant

V.V. TOW INC

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:13; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: L. DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JOHNNY R LACY PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: V.V. TOW INC; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NO SERVICE; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS CONTINUANCE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/27/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY JOHNNY R LACY (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY JOHNNY R LACY (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO V.V. TOW INC. PARTY SERVED ON 03/30/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO V.V. TOW INC. PARTY SERVED ON 03/30/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:02; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JOHNNY R LACY PRESENT; V.V. TOW INC REPRESENTED BY RACHEL JONES.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; WITNESS -- JOHNNY LACY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS TO CONTINUE; REQUEST TO CONTINUE IS DENIED.; WITNESS -- RACHEL JONES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- KEVIN BARNES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; COURT FINDS:; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 12/14/2016 OF JOHNNY LACY ORDERED ENTERED 05/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT V.V. TOW INC; AND AGAINST JOHNNY R LACY; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 05/12/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 05/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:02; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JOHNNY R LACY PRESENT; V.V. TOW INC REPRESENTED BY RACHEL JONES.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; WITNESS -- JOHNNY LACY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS TO CONTINUE; REQUEST TO CONTINUE IS DENIED.; WITNESS -- RACHEL JONES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- KEVIN BARNES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; COURT FINDS:; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 12/14/2016 OF JOHNNY LACY ORDERED ENTERED 05/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT V.V. TOW INC; AND AGAINST JOHNNY R LACY; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO V.V. TOW INC. PARTY SERVED ON 03/30/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JOHNNY R LACY FOR COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $7.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 12/14/2016 OF JOHNNY LACY FOR V.V. TOW INC, ADD VICTOR VALLEY TOWING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY JOHNNY R LACY (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; 08:50; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JOHNNY R LACY PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: V.V. TOW INC; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/08/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; JOHNNY R LACY TO GIVE NOTICE.; LAST CONTINUANCE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:13; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: L. DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JOHNNY R LACY PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: V.V. TOW INC; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NO SERVICE; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS CONTINUANCE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/27/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JOHNNY R LACY IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JOHNNY R LACY FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOHNNY R LACY FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0897 $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOHNNY R LACY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.