This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 20:27:56 (UTC).

LABORERS-V-CITY OF RIALTO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2016 LABORERS-V-CITY OF RIALTO was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8529

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH

LOCAL UNION NO. 783

Respondents

CITY OF RIALTO

CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF RIALTO

Interested Parties

PANATTONI DEVELOPMENT COMPANY,INC.

PDC OC/IE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LOZEAU DRURY, LLP

410 12Th Street, Suite 250

Oakland, CA 94607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF RESPONSIBLE AGENCIES FILED BY CITY OF RIALTO.

NOTICE OF RESPONSIBLE AGENCIES FILED BY CITY OF RIALTO.

PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR HEARING & NOTICE OF REQUEST FILED.

PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR HEARING & NOTICE OF REQUEST FILED.

NOTICE TO ARRY GENERAL-VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT FILED BY LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH.

NOTICE TO ARRY GENERAL-VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT FILED BY LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/28/2016 OF LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/28/2016 OF LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH FOR FAX FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170127-0835 $7.00; 170127-0835-VS Reference Number #026-0004205899

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH FOR FAX FEES ON REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0565 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RESPONSIBLE AGENCIES FILED BY CITY OF RIALTO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR HEARING & NOTICE OF REQUEST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO ARRY GENERAL-VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT FILED BY LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/28/2016 OF LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 161103-0522 $4.00; 161103-0522-VS Reference Number 003763

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH, LOCAL UNION NO. 783 FOR COPY FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161102-0195 $1.50; 161102-0195-VS Reference Number 025-0059851889

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OFNORTH, LOCAL UNION NO. 783 FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161102-0155 $31.00; 161102-0155-VS Reference Number 025-0059849799

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE PETITIONER AND RESPONDENT INFORMATION IS NOT LABELED CORRECTLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.