This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:31:55 (UTC).

LA TORRE -V- AUSTIN

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 LA TORRE -V- AUSTIN was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8322

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL DE LA TORRE

Defendant

NAZARI AUSTIN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO NAZARI AUSTIN WITH COSTS OF $15.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO NAZARI AUSTIN WITH COSTS OF $15.00

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0266 $75.00

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY NAZARI AUSTIN. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY NAZARI AUSTIN. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO NAZARI AUSTIN WITH COSTS OF $40.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO NAZARI AUSTIN WITH COSTS OF $40.00

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF DANIEL DE LA TORRE PRESENT; DEFENDANT NAZARI AUSTIN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NO MEDIATION; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:06; COURT IN RECESS.; COURT RECONVENES AT 11:21 AM; COURT TAKES JUDICIAL NOTICE OF JUDGMENT IN CASE# SMCFS1707766.; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS FOR CONTINUANCE TO GET THE TRANSCRIPT.; DEFENDANT OBJECTS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE.; OVER THE DEFENDANTS OBJECTION, PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/31/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F2.; NOTICE WAIVED.; NO FURTHER CONTINUANCE WILL BE GRANTED.; 11:30; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:08; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: COURTNE DOUGHERTY; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF DANIEL DE LA TORRE PRESENT; DEFENDANT NAZARI AUSTIN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- DANIEL DE LA TORRE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- NAZARI AUSTIN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT IN RECESS.; 11:18; COURT RECONVENES 11:30; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY DEFENDANT .; COURT FINDS:; NO NEW ISSUES. ISSUES SETTLED IN CASE # SMCFS1707766.; COURT FINDS THIS IS RES ADJUDICATA; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: RES ADJUDICATA.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); 11:37; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF DANIEL DE LA TORRE PRESENT; DEFENDANT NAZARI AUSTIN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NO MEDIATION; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:06; COURT IN RECESS.; COURT RECONVENES AT 11:21 AM; COURT TAKES JUDICIAL NOTICE OF JUDGMENT IN CASE# SMCFS1707766.; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS FOR CONTINUANCE TO GET THE TRANSCRIPT.; DEFENDANT OBJECTS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE.; OVER THE DEFENDANTS OBJECTION, PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/31/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F2.; NOTICE WAIVED.; NO FURTHER CONTINUANCE WILL BE GRANTED.; 11:30; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • PROOF RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO NAZARI AUSTIN WITH COSTS OF $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY NAZARI AUSTIN. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO NAZARI AUSTIN WITH COSTS OF $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CERTIFIED MAILING 70131710000176457455 /9590940218486104800109

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0279 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0266 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less