This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:29:56 (UTC).

**COMPLEX** ARNOLD -V- OSF INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 COMPLEX ARNOLD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OSF INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5798

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KYMBERLEE ARNOLD

Defendant

OSF INTERNATIONAL,INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MORRIS NAZARIAN

ALTUS LAW FIRM

Defendant Attorney

FISHER & PHILLIPS,LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OSF INTERNATIONAL,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $119.90 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OSF INTERNATIONAL,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $119.90 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OSF INTERNATIONAL,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $119.90 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OSF INTERNATIONAL,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $119.90 FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE CMC FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE CMC FILED.

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED.

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/04/2017 OF KYMBERLEE ARNOLD AS TO KYMBERLEE ARNOLD ADDING ATTORNEY ALTUS LAW FIRM FILED

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/04/2017 OF KYMBERLEE ARNOLD AS TO KYMBERLEE ARNOLD ADDING ATTORNEY ALTUS LAW FIRM FILED

JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED. HAEGGQUISTE & ECK LLP WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. KYMBERLEE ARNOLD IS NOW REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF MORRIS NAZARIAN.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED. HAEGGQUISTE & ECK LLP WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. KYMBERLEE ARNOLD IS NOW REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF MORRIS NAZARIAN.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING THE COOPER LAW FIRM, P.C WITH HAEGGQUISTE & ECK LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING THE COOPER LAW FIRM, P.C WITH HAEGGQUISTE & ECK LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE OF FIRM CHANGE FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE OF FIRM CHANGE FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAPTON WITH FISHER & PHILLIPS,LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR OSF INTERNATIONAL,INC..

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAPTON WITH FISHER & PHILLIPS,LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR OSF INTERNATIONAL,INC..

NOTICE OF POSTING COMPLEX FEE FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE OF POSTING COMPLEX FEE FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE OF FILING FEES DUE FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE OF FILING FEES DUE FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketVACATE FRCMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE CMC FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY OSF INTERNATIONAL,INC. FOR STIP AND ORDER FEE TO CONTINUE CMC AND LEAVE TO AM; Minutes; Receipt: 190524-0339 $20.00; 190524-0339-CK Reference Number CK D3678067

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketHEARING RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SEAN NGUYEN AND ANDREW JARAMILLO PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENSE APPEARS BY TELECOM.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE HELD.; 02:49; DISCOVERY CONFERENCE CONCLUDED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MORRIS NAZARIAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.; ATTORNEY NATALIE FUJIKAWA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR OSF INTERNATIONAL,INC..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REPRESENTS THAT THEY MAY MOVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE A 1ST AMENDED TO; COMPLAINT TO ADD DEFENDANTS. ADDITIONALLY, MEDIATION IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/30/19.; COURT FINDS:; STAY PREVIOUSLY LIFTED FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ONLY. THE COURT FURTHER LIFTS THE STAY ON THE; ALLEGED JOINT EMPLOYMENT ISSUE. ADDITIONALLY, IF COUNSEL HAVE A DISPUTE REGARDING THE DISCOVERY,; THEY ARE REQUIRED TO SCHEDULE AN INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE WITH THE COURT.; THE COURT SETS PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO THE FILING OF A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A 1ST AMENDED; COMPLAINT FOR 06/03/19.; PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER IN ADVANCE OF FILING THE MOTION TO SEE IF A STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO; FILE THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT; IF NO AGREEMENT IS REACHED, PLAINTIFF MAY TELEPHONE THE; DEPARTMENT DIRECTLY TO RECEIVE A DATE TO HEAR PLAINTIFFS MOTION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/03/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/23/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCOMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER VIVIAN TRISTAN 14244; COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SEAN NGUYEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.; ATTORNEY MORRIS NAZARIAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR KYMBERLEE ARNOLD.; ATTORNEY ALDEN PARKER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR OSF INTERNATIONAL,INC..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; DISCUSSION IS HELD BETWEEN COURT AND COUNSEL REGARDING PLAINTIFF POTENTIALLY AMENDING THE; COMPLAINT TO INCLUDE NEW DEFENDANTS (FRANCHISEES).; COURT FINDS:; DISCOVERY STAY WAS PREVIOUSLY LIFTED, BUT LIMITED TO CLASS CERTIFICATION ONLY. PARTIES ARE FREE TO; CONDUCT DISCOVERY OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF CLASS CERTIFICATION BY MUTUAL AGREEMENT, WITHOUT A; FURTHER COURT ORDER.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENSE COUNSEL, TO ATTEND MEDIATION.; HEARINGS:; FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170418-0649 $3.00; 170418-0649-VS Reference Number 033-0015748293

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY KYMBERLEE ARNOLD FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170404-0452 $435.00; 170404-0452-CK Reference Number #114666

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/04/2017 OF KYMBERLEE ARNOLD FOR KYMBERLEE ARNOLD, ATTORNEY THE CARTER LAW FIRM ADDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/04/2017 OF KYMBERLEE ARNOLD FOR KYMBERLEE ARNOLD, ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF MORRIS NAZARIAN ADDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less