Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 00:55:44 (UTC).

KWOKTAK CHAN-V-JUAN RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 KWOKTAK CHAN-V-JUAN RODRIGUEZ was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1311

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KWOKTAK CHAN

Defendants

JESSIE J VALENZUELA

SERENA VALENZUELA

ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ

ANGEL A VALENZUELA

JUAN C RODRIGUEZ

Other

ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CCP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINDHAM, WILLIAM E

1001 E Morton Pl Ste C

Hemet, CA 92543

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

EX PARTE MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATE DEFAULT/STAY WRIT FILED.

EX PARTE MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATE DEFAULT/STAY WRIT FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 170710-0550 $25.00; 170710-0550-CK Reference Number 25013

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/14/2017 OF KWOKTAK CHAN ORDERED ENTERED 07/07/17; JUDGMENT FOR: KWOKTAK CHAN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUAN C RODRIGUEZ, ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ, JESSIE J VALENZUELA, ANGEL A VALENZUELA, SERENA VALENZUELA, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CCP; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JUAN C RODRIGUEZ, ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ, JESSIE J VALENZUELA, ANGEL A VALENZUELA, SERENA VALENZUELA, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CCP. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JUAN C RODRIGUEZ, JESSIE J VALENZUELA, ANGEL A VALENZUELA, SERENA VALENZUELA, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CCP.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JUAN C RODRIGUEZ, JESSIE J VALENZUELA, ANGEL A VALENZUELA, SERENA VALENZUELA, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CCP.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CCP ON 06/18/17 WITH FEES OF $90.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CCP ON 06/18/17 WITH FEES OF $90.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ANGEL A VALENZUELA SERVED ON 06/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ANGEL A VALENZUELA SERVED ON 06/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SERENA VALENZUELA SERVED ON 06/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SERENA VALENZUELA SERVED ON 06/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JESSIE J VALENZUELA; PARTY SERVED ON 06/18/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JESSIE J VALENZUELA; PARTY SERVED ON 06/18/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JUAN C RODRIGUEZ SERVED ON 06/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JUAN C RODRIGUEZ SERVED ON 06/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 06/18/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 06/18/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170614-0560 $255.00; 170614-0560-CK Reference Number 24898

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170815-0811 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • MOTION RE: MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATE DEFAULT /STAY WRIT FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:44; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JENNIFER GARNER; BAILIFF: EUGENE BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM WINDHAM PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JUAN C RODRIGUEZ, JESSIE J VALENZUELA, ANGEL A VALENZUELA, SERENA VALENZUELA; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED; EX PARTE ORDER SIGNED BY THE COURT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/14/2017 OF KWOKTAK CHAN FOR ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ, ATTORNEY PRO/PER ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/14/2017 OF KWOKTAK CHAN AS TO ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROXANNA M RODRIGUEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 06/18/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KWOKTAK CHAN FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170626-0824 $5.00; 170626-0824-MC Reference Number 026-0054045056

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JESSIE J VALENZUELA FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170622-0241 $1.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $41.09.--BEGINNING ON 07/02/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170614-0560 $255.00; 170614-0560-CK Reference Number 24898

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINDHAM, WILLIAM E