This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/02/2019 at 06:49:51 (UTC).

KWIKCASH -V- RUIZ

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 KWIKCASH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0875

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KWIKCASH,INC

Defendant

SANDOR O RUIZ

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 3393.12 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 3393.12 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 3393.12 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 3393.12 ) (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF KWIKCASH,INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF KWIKCASH,INC FILED. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED -- NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED -- NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; KWIKCASH,INC REPRESENTED BY AMERICA BASURTO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SANDOR O RUIZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SANDOR O RUIZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- AMERICA BASURTO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 05/15/2017 OF KWIKCASH,INC ORDERED ENTERED 09/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: KWIKCASH,INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SANDOR O RUIZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,203.12 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $165.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,368.12; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SANDOR O RUIZ SERVED ON 07/27/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SANDOR O RUIZ SERVED ON 07/27/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL BY MAIL ON 06/27/17 AS TO SANDOR O RUIZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL BY MAIL ON 06/27/17 AS TO SANDOR O RUIZ, FILED.

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170519-0176 $100.00; 170519-0176-CK Reference Number 7730

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 09/08/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KWIKCASH,INC FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 171220-0706 $25.00; 171220-0706-CK Reference Number 8523

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 3393.12 ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 3393.12 ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KWIKCASH,INC FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 171024-0567 $25.00; 171024-0567-CK Reference Number 8341

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 09/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF KWIKCASH,INC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED -- NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA O'BRIEN; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; KWIKCASH,INC REPRESENTED BY AMERICA BASURTO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SANDOR O RUIZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SANDOR O RUIZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- AMERICA BASURTO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 05/15/2017 OF KWIKCASH,INC ORDERED ENTERED 09/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: KWIKCASH,INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SANDOR O RUIZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,203.12 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $165.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,368.12; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SANDOR O RUIZ SERVED ON 07/27/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL BY MAIL ON 06/27/17 AS TO SANDOR O RUIZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170519-0176 $100.00; 170519-0176-CK Reference Number 7730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less