This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:30:31 (UTC).

KUSH CONCEPTS, ET AL -V- CITY OF SN BDO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 KUSH CONCEPTS filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF SN BDO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2131

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILD WEST PATIENTSALLIANCE INC.

THE WAREHOUSE PLACE

GOOD TIMES ORGANICS INC.

THE BREAK ROOM GROUP

CAREONE MEDICAL SUPPLY CORP.

JFTC GROUP INC.

FNG VENTURES, INC.

DMRX GROUP INC.

MJ DISPENSARY INC.

COLD CREEK ORGANICS

KUSH CONCEPTS COLLECTIVE

SUPREME MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC.

CORONA PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

ADVANCED HEALTH THERAPIES, INC.

HELPING HANDS MEDICAL CAREGIVERS, INC.

ADVANCED AMERIGREEN

EVOLUTION HEALTH, INC.

THC HEALTH CONSULTANTS

THC FOR ME REMEDIES, INC

Defendant

CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES DEAGUILERA

2068 Orange Tree Lane Suite 218

Redlands, CA 92374

DANIEL S MILLER

412 Olive St #620

Huntington Beach, CA 92648

Defendant Attorneys

COTA COLE & HUBER LLP

3401 Centrelake Dr Suite 670

Ontario, CA 91761

SANEZ, GARY D

290 N D Street 3Rd Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL S MILLER

412 Olive St #620

Huntington Beach, CA 92648

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0681 $435.00; 170206-0681-CK Reference Number 12730

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0681 $435.00; 170206-0681-CK Reference Number 12730

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • DCA ORDER PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE & RQST FOR STAY ARE DENIED PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF KUSH CONCEPTS COLLECTIVE ORDERED ENTERED 02/28/18; JUDGMENT FOR: KUSH CONCEPTS COLLECTIVE, MJ DISPENSARY INC., JFTC GROUP INC., WILD WEST PATIENTSALLIANCE INC., CAREONE MEDICAL SUPPLY CORP., ACCESSIBLE OPTIONS,INC., GREEN HORNET SOCIALCLUB, INC., ATLAS ORGANICS CORPORATION; JUDGMENT FOR: THC HEALTH CONSULTANTS, STREET MEDICAL, INC., POWERHOUSE MEDICINALS, ADVANCED HEALTH THERAPIES, INC., EVOLUTION HEALTH, INC., VICTORY ORGANICS CORPORATION, ADVANCED AMERIGREEN, THC CONNECTION, INC.; JUDGMENT FOR: CANNACORE MEDICAL NETWORK, CAREPOINT MEDICAL GROUP,INC., NEW AGE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO; SEE JUDGMENT FILED 02/28/18 FOR SPECIFICS OF JUDGMENT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION FILED.; Minutes; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • CITY OF SAN BERNARDINOS RESPONSE TO COURTS TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION DATED 1/18/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR FAX FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $4.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF DECISION FILED BY BUBBA LIKES TORTILLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE TRO BY BUBBA LIKES TORTILLA 1/23/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TRO AND STAY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DANIEL ROBERTS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO.; ATTORNEY ROGER DIAMOND, VIA COURTCALL IS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFFS IN RELATED CASE CIVDS1704276.; ATTORNEY BEN EILENBERG PRESENT ON BEHALF OF CROSS-DEFENDANT BUBBA LIKES TORTILLAS IN RELATED; MATTER CIVDS1704276.; PLAINTIFF KARMEL ROE (RELATED CASE CIVDS1712424) PRESENT IN PRO PER.; ATTORNEY MARTIN HOM PRESENT FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT IN RELATED CASE CIVDS1712424, SB UNIFIED SCHOOL; DISTRICT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, GARY SAENZ, MARK SCOTT AND MARK PERSICOS EXPARTE; APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER/STAY OF ENFORCEMENT AND IMPLEMENTATION OF MEASURE O.; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE APPLICATION ARGUED.; COURT FINDS:; EX PARTE ORDERS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER/STAY IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KUSH CONCEPTS COLLECTIVE FOR CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, ATTORNEY GARY D SANEZ ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KUSH CONCEPTS COLLECTIVE FOR CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, ATTORNEY COTA COLE & HUBER LLP ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF LITIGATION FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0342 $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KUSH CONCEPTS COLLECTIVE, MJ DISPENSARY INC., JFTC GROUP INC., GOOD TIMES ORGANICSINC., COLD CREEK ORGANICS, FNG VENTURES, INC., SUPREME MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC., WILD WEST PATIENTSALLIANCE INC., THE WAREHOUSE PLACE, THE BREAK ROOM GROUP, DMRX GROUP INC. IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0681 $435.00; 170206-0681-CK Reference Number 12730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.