This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/07/2018 at 03:27:13 (UTC).

KSDB, INC.,-V-CITY OF UPLAND, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2011 KSDB, INC ,-V-CITY OF UPLAND was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3678

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

KSDB, INC.,

Defendants and Respondents

JOHN EDWARD HENNES

JOHN VICTOR POMIERSKI

STEVE ADAMS

CITY OF UPLAND

JH BUILDERS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

THE FOLEY GROUP, PLC

1600 Dove Street Suite 101

New Port Beach, CA 92660

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BROWN, WHITE & NEWHOUSE LLP

333 South Hope Street 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

ROBERT F SCHAUER

215 North Second Avenue Ste F

Upland, CA 91786

CARPENTER ROTHANS & DUMONT

500 South Grand Avenue 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

RICHARDS WATSON & GERSHON

355 South Grand Avenue 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2013
  • MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY DEFT JH BUILDERS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • VACATE LM37 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/26/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • VACATE STATC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/26/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KSDB, INC., FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 130220-0139 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO JH BUILDERS INC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY DEFT JH BUILDERS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • MOTION RE: (12/18/12) FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY DEFENDANT JH BUILDERS INC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JH BUILDERS INC FOR FAX FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 130125-1305 $5.00; 130125-1305-VS Reference Number 023-0155239214

    Read MoreRead Less
242 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2011
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DEMURRER FILED BY CITY OF UPLAND; REPRESENTED BY RICHARDS WATSON & GERSHON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES (06/08/11) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY OF UPLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110426-3927 $11.00; 110426-3927-CK Reference Number 54741

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110421-1530 $8.00; 110421-1530-CK Reference Number 56246

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO CITY OF UPLAND. PARTY SERVED ON 04/11/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $156.75.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/12/2011 OF KSDB, INC., - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110412-1471 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.