This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 02:42:34 (UTC).

KRISTINA LEE JENSEN -N- ROBERT LOUIS GOINS

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 KRISTINA LEE JENSEN -N- ROBERT LOUIS GOINS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1526

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KRISTINA LEE JENSEN

Respondent

ROBERT LOUIS GOINS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2013
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 130520-1582 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED. CHRISTINA FERRANTE WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. KRISTINA LEE JENSEN IS NOW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • JDGMT/NOE MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/04/2011 OF KRISTINA JENSEN FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/04/2011 OF KRISTINA JENSEN ORDERED ENTERED 02/07/13; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 02/07/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • JUDGMENT RECVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • NOTICE OF REJECTED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT IS RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: ON A DEFAULT JUDGMENT, THE JUDGMENT MUST MATCH; THE PETITION EXACTLY. THERE IS ADDITIONAL PROPERTY MENTIONED ON THE JUDGMENT. YOU MAY; EITHER FILE AND SERVE AN AMENDED PETITION, FILE PAPERWORK FOR A HEARING FOR THE COURT TO MAKE; ORDERS REGARDING PROPERTY, OR HAVE THE RESPONDENT SIGN A STIPULATED JUDGMENT WITH THE; RESPONDENTS SIGNATURE NOTARIZED.; NOTICES PRINTED; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • CASE SENT TO BIN #2 FOR PROCESSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON ROBERT LOUIS GOINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH CHRISTINA FERRANTE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR KRISTINA LEE JENSEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/04/2011 OF KRISTINA JENSEN AS TO ROBERT LOUIS GOINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): FORM IS INCOMPLETE SEE RED CHECKED AREA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • RETURNED DEFAULT PLACED IN MAXIM ATTY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/PETITION FILED AS TO ROBERT LOUIS GOINS. PARTY SERVED ON 05/08/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • NOTICE OF REJECTED JGMNT SENT.; Minutes; NEED CASE NUMBERS ON ALL DOCUMENTS. CANNOT ATTACH THIS STIP FOR JUDGMENT. IF RESPONDENT IS; APPEARING BY FILING THE APPEARANCE STIPULATION AND WAIVER FORM, A FEE OF $435.00 IS REQUIRED.; NEED PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FOR RESPONDENT IF FILING A RESPONSE. NEED LEGAL; DESCRIPTION OF PROPERTY AND ADDRESS ALL ISSUES. PLEASE SEEK LEGAL ADVICE (SEE ENCLOSED FLYER).; PLEASE TAKE OUT ALL BLANK DOCUMENTS..; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED BY KRISTINA LEE JENSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4435 $395.00; 110504-4435-CK Reference Number 706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R16

    Read MoreRead Less