This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:18:30 (UTC).

KRISTIA SMITH-V-DORIS ACHOY

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 KRISTIA SMITH-V-DORIS ACHOY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1578

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRISTIA SMITH

Defendant

DORIS ACHOY

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DORIS ACHOY SERVED ON 10/05/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DORIS ACHOY SERVED ON 10/05/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0210 $32.50; 170914-0210-DB Reference Number 026-0067671083

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF KRISTIA SMITH PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DORIS ACHOY; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:19; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; DORIS ACHOY HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- KRISTIA SMITH IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DORIS ACHOY.; JUDGMENT FOR: KRISTIA SMITH; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DORIS ACHOY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $533.61 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $32.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $566.11; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 10/31/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF KRISTIA SMITH PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DORIS ACHOY; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:19; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; DORIS ACHOY HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- KRISTIA SMITH IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DORIS ACHOY.; JUDGMENT FOR: KRISTIA SMITH; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DORIS ACHOY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $533.61 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $32.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $566.11; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DORIS ACHOY SERVED ON 10/05/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • ADVISED THE PLAINTIFF OF THE COURT ROOM DRESS CODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0210 $32.50; 170914-0210-DB Reference Number 026-0067671083

    Read MoreRead Less