This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 08:52:27 (UTC).

KMF-V-MCMULLEN

Case Summary

On 08/17/2011 KMF-V-MCMULLEN was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0445

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KMF CHINO LLC

Defendants

PAOLA MCMULLEN

JOSEPH A MCMULLEN

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD A. BRISCO & ASSOCIATES

1900 South State College Blvd Suite #275

Anaheim, CA 92806

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2012
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR LETTER IS PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE MEETING OF CREDITORS & DEADLINES FILED 2/7/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED BY KMF CHINO LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( SENT IN SASE ); Minutes; Receipt: 111230-0792 $25.00; 111230-0792-CK Reference Number 13254

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/17/2011 OF KMF CHINO LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: KMF CHINO LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSEPH A MCMULLEN, PAOLA MCMULLEN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,165.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $382.48 COSTS $485.00 AND DAMAGES $1,159.80.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,192.28; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/17/2011 OF KMF CHINO LLC AS TO JOSEPH A MCMULLEN, PAOLA MCMULLEN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JOSEPH A MCMULLEN, PAOLA MCMULLEN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/16/11 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/17/2011 OF KMF CHINO LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON PAOLA MCMULLEN; PARTY SERVED ON 08/16/11 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOSEPH A MCMULLEN; PARTY SERVED ON 08/16/11 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110822-0935 $255.00; 110822-0935-CK Reference Number 11900

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KMF CHINO, LLC is a litigant