This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/01/2019 at 21:09:12 (UTC).

KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR-V-HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR-V-HERNANDEZ was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5797

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR, LLC

Defendants

LISA HERNANDEZ

MARCUS VALDEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (LODGED) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (LODGED) FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR,LLC.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR,LLC.

ANSWER FILED BY LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING IMAGED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

EX PARTE RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATING JUDGMENT FILED BY LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ

EX PARTE RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATING JUDGMENT FILED BY LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/30/2019 OF KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR,LLC AS TO LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ( FWD TO SHERIFF)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/30/2019 OF KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR,LLC AS TO LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ( FWD TO SHERIFF); Minutes; Receipt: 191025-0057 $25.00; 191025-0057-CK Reference Number 568065

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/30/2019 OF KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR,LLC ORDERED ENTERED 10/23/19; JUDGMENT FOR 10/30/19.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 10/30/19; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); PLAINTIFF PREVAILS; ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARCUS VALDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 10/02/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARCUS VALDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 10/02/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 10/02/19 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 10/02/19 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LISA HERNANDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 10/02/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LISA HERNANDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 10/02/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 190930-0656 $255.00; 190930-0656-CK Reference Number 567392

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLIANCE / ENTRY OF JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (LODGED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/30/2019 OF KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR,LLC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL GOODWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT LISA HERNANDEZ PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARCUS VALDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; STIPULATION LODGED; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : COMPLIANCE / ENTRY OF JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL SET FOR 12/02/19 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • NTC RULING RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR,LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATING JUDGMENT; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL GOODWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT LISA HERNANDEZ PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARCUS VALDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:16; LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE; DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; WITNESS -- LISA HERNANDEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF .; LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/30/2019 OF KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR,LLC.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/30/2019 OF KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR,LLC ORDERED SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ; COURT ORDERS WRIT QUASHED AND LOCKOUT CANCELED.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO NOTIFY SHERIFF; ANSWER OF LISA HERNANDEZ, MARCUS VALDEZ DEEMED FILED.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/30/2019 OF KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR,LLC IS SET FOR 11/12/19 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; OF TRIAL DATE; 09:28; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LISA HERNANDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 10/02/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PROOF OF SERVICE ADDRESS INCORRECT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER 60 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $41.66.--BEGINNING ON 10/01/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 190930-0656 $255.00; 190930-0656-CK Reference Number 567392

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINGSLEY MONTCLAIR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHTON, HELAINE S